EP1676442 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR MANAGING AN INTERACTIVE VIDEO DISPLAY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.09.2016 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.10.2016 [2016/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intellectual Ventures Holding 67 LLC 7251 W. Lake Mead Blvd., Suite 300 Las Vegas, NV 89128 / US | [2009/34] |
Former [2007/01] | For all designated states Reactrix Systems, Inc. 301 Chesapeake Drive Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | ||
Former [2006/27] | For all designated states Reactrix Systems, Inc. 1680 Bayport Avenue San Carlos, CA 94070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BELL, Matthew 4245 Los Palos Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | 02 /
BELFER, Russell, H. 301 Chesapeake Drive Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | [2007/29] |
Former [2006/27] | 01 /
BELL, Matthew 4245 Los Palos Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | ||
02 /
BELFER, Russell, H. 1125 Juanita Avenue Burlingame, CA 94010 / US | Representative(s) | Kazi, Ilya Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/21] | Kazi, Ilya Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | ||
Former [2008/13] | Käck, Jürgen, et al Kahler Käck Mollekopf Vorderer Anger 239 D-86899 Landsberg/Lech / DE | ||
Former [2006/27] | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al LADAS & PARRY LLP Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04796450.7 | 25.10.2004 | [2006/27] | WO2004US35477 | Priority number, date | US20030514232P | 24.10.2003 Original published format: US 514232 P | [2006/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005041578 | Date: | 06.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1676442 | Date: | 05.07.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/173, G06F3/00, H04N7/18 | [2006/27] | CPC: |
H04N21/44218 (EP,US);
H04N7/173 (KR);
G06Q30/02 (EP,US);
H04N21/25891 (EP,US);
H04N21/41415 (EP,US);
H04N21/4223 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR VERWALTUNG EINES INTERAKTIVEN VIDEO-DISPLAY-SYSTEMS | [2006/27] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR MANAGING AN INTERACTIVE VIDEO DISPLAY SYSTEM | [2006/27] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME POUR GERER UN SYSTEME D'AFFICHAGE VIDEO INTERACTIF | [2006/27] | Entry into regional phase | 08.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 08.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/27] | 11.07.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/40] | 30.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2007 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   15.02.2008 | 31.10.2008 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   17.04.2009 | 31.10.2015 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5510828 (LUTTERBACH R STEVEN [US], et al) [X] 1,23,39 * column 4, line 18 - column 5, line 5 *; | [Y]WO0163916 (INTERVAL RESEARCH CORP [US]) [Y] 9-22,31-38,47-54 * page 4, line 2 - line 16 * * page 12, line 9 - page 16, line 14 * * page 18, line 5 - line 11 * * page 22, line 12 - page 23, line 16 *; | [A]US2002178440 (AGNIHOTRI LALITHA [US], et al) [A] 1-54 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0020] *; | [DXY]US2002186221 (BELL MATTHEW [US]) [DX] 1-8,23-30,39-46 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0073] * [Y] 9-22,31-38,47-54; | [A]US2003093784 (DIMITROVA NEVENKA [US], et al) [A] 1-54 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0049] *; | [A] - KAUSHAL KURAPATI ET AL, "A Multi-Agent TV Recommender", WORKSHOP ON PERSONALIZATION IN FUTURE TV, (20010713), pages 1 - 8, XP002228385 [A] 1-54 * abstract * |