EP1684942 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR GRINDING AND/OR POLISHING AN EDGE OF A GLASS SHEET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.06.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corning Incorporated Life Sciences 40 Nagog Park Acton MA 01720 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/31] | For all designated states Corning Incorporated Life Sciences, 45 Nagog Park Acton, MA 01720 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROWN, James William 3584Conhocton Road Painted Post, New York 14870 / US | 02 /
GIERBOLINI, Clive Darrell 204 Woodsedge Drive Painted Post, New York 14870 / US | 03 /
ONO, Toshihiko 2753-547, Takao Fukuroi-shi, Shizuoka, JP 437-0023 / JP | 04 /
RAJ, Babak Robert 1060 West Second Street Elmira, New York 14905 / US | 05 /
SCHAEFFLER, Robert George 1554 Mt. Zoar Road Pine City, NY 14871 / US | [2007/15] |
Former [2006/31] | 01 /
BROWN, James William 51 Erwin Street Painted Post, New York 14870 / US | ||
02 /
GIERBOLINI, Clive Darrell 204 Woodsedge Drive Painted Post, New York 14870 / US | |||
03 /
ONO, Toshihiko 2753-547, Takao Fukuroi-shi, Shizuoka, JP 437-0023 / JP | |||
04 /
RAJ, Babak Robert 1060 West Second Street Elmira, New York 14905 / US | |||
05 /
SCHAEFFLER, Robert George 1554 Mt. Zoar Road Pine City, NY 14871 / US | Representative(s) | Boon, Graham Anthony Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/31] | Boon, Graham Anthony Elkington and Fife LLP, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 04796455.6 | 22.10.2004 | [2006/31] | WO2004US35483 | Priority number, date | US20030694693 | 27.10.2003 Original published format: US 694693 | [2006/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005044512 | Date: | 19.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1684942 | Date: | 02.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1684942 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B24B9/10 | [2006/31] | CPC: |
B24B55/04 (EP,US);
B24B9/10 (EP,KR,US);
B24B55/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2007/05] |
Former [2006/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM SCHLEIFEN UND/ODER POLIEREN EINER KANTE EINER GLASSCHEIBE | [2006/31] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR GRINDING AND/OR POLISHING AN EDGE OF A GLASS SHEET | [2006/31] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE POUR MEULER ET/OU POLIR LES CHANTS DE VITRES | [2006/31] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/31] | 28.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US6231429 (LISEC PETER [AT]) [A] 1,8,15,18 * the whole document *; | [A]US4716686 (LISEC PETER [AT]) [A] 1,8,15,18 * column 4, line 29 - column 9, line 15; figures 3-8 *; | [A]EP1314513 (LENHARDT MASCHINENBAU [DE]) |