EP1697125 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A FIRE-RETARDANT VENEER, AND CORRESPONDING FIRE-RETARDANT VENEER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FACC AG Fischerstrasse 9 4910 Ried im Innkreis / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/10] | For all designated states FACC AG Fischerstrasse 9 4910 Ried Im Innkreis / AT | ||
Former [2006/36] | For all designated states Fischer Advanced Composite Components AG Fischerstrasse 9 4910 Ried im Innkreis / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEPHAN, Walter Diesseits 233 A-4973 St. Martin / AT | 02 /
EINBÖCK, Johann Münsteuer 49 A-4980 Antiesenhofen / AT | [2006/36] | Representative(s) | SONN Patentanwälte GmbH & Co KG Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2006/36] | Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 04796938.1 | 09.11.2004 | [2006/36] | WO2004AT00393 | Priority number, date | AT20030002066 | 22.12.2003 Original published format: AT 20662003 | [2006/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005061221 | Date: | 07.07.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1697125 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1697125 | Date: | 13.05.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B32B21/06, B32B21/08, E04B1/00 | [2006/36] | CPC: |
B32B3/12 (EP,US);
B32B21/08 (US);
B32B21/14 (EP,US);
B32B5/28 (EP,US);
B44C5/0469 (EP,US);
B44C5/0484 (EP,US);
B44C5/0492 (EP,US);
B32B2305/024 (US);
B32B2307/3065 (US);
B32B2317/12 (US);
E04B1/94 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31504 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES BRANDHEMMENDEN FURNIERS SOWIE BRANDHEMMENDES FURNIER | [2006/36] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A FIRE-RETARDANT VENEER, AND CORRESPONDING FIRE-RETARDANT VENEER | [2006/36] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE FEUILLE DE PLACAGE IGNIFUGEE ET FEUILLE DE PLACAGE IGNIFUGEE CORRESPONDANTE | [2006/36] | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/36] | 22.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.02.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 13.05.2009 | CZ | 13.05.2009 | DK | 13.05.2009 | EE | 13.05.2009 | FI | 13.05.2009 | IE | 13.05.2009 | NL | 13.05.2009 | PL | 13.05.2009 | RO | 13.05.2009 | SI | 13.05.2009 | SK | 13.05.2009 | TR | 13.05.2009 | BG | 13.08.2009 | SE | 13.08.2009 | GR | 14.08.2009 | IS | 13.09.2009 | PT | 13.09.2009 | LU | 09.11.2009 | HU | 14.11.2009 | BE | 30.11.2009 | CH | 30.11.2009 | LI | 30.11.2009 | MC | 30.11.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | CZ | 13.05.2009 | |
DK | 13.05.2009 | ||
EE | 13.05.2009 | ||
FI | 13.05.2009 | ||
IE | 13.05.2009 | ||
NL | 13.05.2009 | ||
PL | 13.05.2009 | ||
RO | 13.05.2009 | ||
SI | 13.05.2009 | ||
SK | 13.05.2009 | ||
BG | 13.08.2009 | ||
SE | 13.08.2009 | ||
GR | 14.08.2009 | ||
IS | 13.09.2009 | ||
PT | 13.09.2009 | ||
LU | 09.11.2009 | ||
HU | 14.11.2009 | ||
BE | 30.11.2009 | ||
CH | 30.11.2009 | ||
LI | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | CZ | 13.05.2009 | |
DK | 13.05.2009 | ||
EE | 13.05.2009 | ||
FI | 13.05.2009 | ||
IE | 13.05.2009 | ||
NL | 13.05.2009 | ||
PL | 13.05.2009 | ||
RO | 13.05.2009 | ||
SI | 13.05.2009 | ||
SK | 13.05.2009 | ||
BG | 13.08.2009 | ||
SE | 13.08.2009 | ||
GR | 14.08.2009 | ||
IS | 13.09.2009 | ||
PT | 13.09.2009 | ||
LU | 09.11.2009 | ||
BE | 30.11.2009 | ||
CH | 30.11.2009 | ||
LI | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/51] | CZ | 13.05.2009 | |
DK | 13.05.2009 | ||
EE | 13.05.2009 | ||
FI | 13.05.2009 | ||
IE | 13.05.2009 | ||
NL | 13.05.2009 | ||
PL | 13.05.2009 | ||
RO | 13.05.2009 | ||
SI | 13.05.2009 | ||
SK | 13.05.2009 | ||
BG | 13.08.2009 | ||
SE | 13.08.2009 | ||
GR | 14.08.2009 | ||
IS | 13.09.2009 | ||
PT | 13.09.2009 | ||
BE | 30.11.2009 | ||
CH | 30.11.2009 | ||
LI | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/46] | CZ | 13.05.2009 | |
DK | 13.05.2009 | ||
EE | 13.05.2009 | ||
FI | 13.05.2009 | ||
IE | 13.05.2009 | ||
NL | 13.05.2009 | ||
PL | 13.05.2009 | ||
RO | 13.05.2009 | ||
SI | 13.05.2009 | ||
SK | 13.05.2009 | ||
BG | 13.08.2009 | ||
SE | 13.08.2009 | ||
GR | 14.08.2009 | ||
IS | 13.09.2009 | ||
PT | 13.09.2009 | ||
CH | 30.11.2009 | ||
LI | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/30] | CZ | 13.05.2009 | |
DK | 13.05.2009 | ||
EE | 13.05.2009 | ||
FI | 13.05.2009 | ||
IE | 13.05.2009 | ||
NL | 13.05.2009 | ||
PL | 13.05.2009 | ||
RO | 13.05.2009 | ||
SI | 13.05.2009 | ||
SK | 13.05.2009 | ||
BG | 13.08.2009 | ||
SE | 13.08.2009 | ||
IS | 13.09.2009 | ||
PT | 13.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/18] | CZ | 13.05.2009 | |
DK | 13.05.2009 | ||
EE | 13.05.2009 | ||
FI | 13.05.2009 | ||
IE | 13.05.2009 | ||
NL | 13.05.2009 | ||
PL | 13.05.2009 | ||
RO | 13.05.2009 | ||
SI | 13.05.2009 | ||
SK | 13.05.2009 | ||
BG | 13.08.2009 | ||
SE | 13.08.2009 | ||
IS | 13.09.2009 | ||
PT | 13.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | CZ | 13.05.2009 | |
DK | 13.05.2009 | ||
EE | 13.05.2009 | ||
FI | 13.05.2009 | ||
IE | 13.05.2009 | ||
NL | 13.05.2009 | ||
PL | 13.05.2009 | ||
RO | 13.05.2009 | ||
SI | 13.05.2009 | ||
SK | 13.05.2009 | ||
SE | 13.08.2009 | ||
IS | 13.09.2009 | ||
PT | 13.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | FI | 13.05.2009 | |
IE | 13.05.2009 | ||
NL | 13.05.2009 | ||
PL | 13.05.2009 | ||
SI | 13.05.2009 | ||
SE | 13.08.2009 | ||
IS | 13.09.2009 | ||
PT | 13.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/01] | FI | 13.05.2009 | |
NL | 13.05.2009 | ||
PL | 13.05.2009 | ||
SI | 13.05.2009 | ||
SE | 13.08.2009 | ||
IS | 13.09.2009 | ||
PT | 13.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/51] | FI | 13.05.2009 | |
NL | 13.05.2009 | ||
SI | 13.05.2009 | ||
SE | 13.08.2009 | ||
IS | 13.09.2009 | ||
PT | 13.09.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3914513 (BROWN ALISTAIR CHALMERS RAMSAY, et al) [A] 1-4 * column 1, line 48 - column 2, line 24 *; | [A]DE2823574 (FOREST PROD UTIL LAB) [A] 1-4 * pages 6-9 *; | [A]US4247332 (KINOSHITA TSUKURU, et al) [A] 4,5* column W *; | [A]DE3316197 (STOECKERT EDGAR) [A] 1-4 * page 6; claim 1 *; | [A]DE19844431 (MADER HEINZ B [DE], et al) [A] 5 * claims 3-7 * |