EP1688428 - METHOD OF ANTIGEN INCORPORATION INTO NEISSERIA BACTERIAL OUTER MEMBRANE VESICLES AND RESULTING VACCINE FORMULATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.05.2010 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.06.2010 [2010/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CENTRO DE INGENIERIA GENETICA Y BIOTECNOLOGIA Departamento de Patentes Ave. 31 entre 158 y 190, Cubanacan, Playa Ciudad de La Habana 10600 / CU | [2006/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIEBLA PEREZ, Olivia, Calle: 186 3115 entre 31 y 33 Apto 9D, Cubanacán, Playa La Habana 12100 / CU | 02 /
PAJON FEYT, Rolando Calle 150 24312 entre 245 y 243, Bauta La Habana 32400 / CU | 03 /
GONZALEZ BLANCO, Sonia, Calle 186 3112 entre 31 y 33A Apto 42, Cubanacán, Playa La Habana 12100 / CU | 04 /
MARTIN DUNN, Alejandro, Miguel, Calle 31 18207 entre 182 y 184 Apto 11, Cubanacán, Playa La Habana 12100 / CU | 05 /
DELGADO ESPINA, Maité, Calle 186 3112 entre 31 y 33A Apto 10 Cubanacán, Playa La Habana 12100 / CU | 06 /
GARAY PEREZ, Hilda, Elisa, Avenida 31 18207 entre 182 y 184 Apto 20, Cubanacán, Playa La Habana 12100 / CU | 07 /
GUILLEN NIETO, Gerardo, Enrique, Calle Linea 6 entre N y O piso 4 Vedado La Habana 10400 / CU | [2006/32] | Representative(s) | van Loon, C.J.J., et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | van Loon, C.J.J., et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2006/32] | van Loon, C.J.J., et al c/o VEREENIGDE Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 04797391.2 | 03.11.2004 | [2006/32] | WO2004CU00012 | Priority number, date | CU25403 | 04.11.2003 Original published format: CU 25403 | [2006/32] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005042571 | Date: | 12.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1688428 | Date: | 09.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/22, A61K39/00 | [2006/32] | CPC: |
C07K14/22 (EP,US);
A61K39/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/32] | Extension states | AL | 25.04.2006 | HR | 25.04.2006 | LT | 25.04.2006 | LV | 25.04.2006 | MK | 25.04.2006 | YU | 25.04.2006 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM EINBAU EINES ANTIGENS IN DIE AUSSENMEMBRANVESIKEL VON NEISSERIA-BAKTERIEN UND DARAUS ERHALTENE IMPFSTOFFFORMULIERUNGEN | [2006/32] | English: | METHOD OF ANTIGEN INCORPORATION INTO NEISSERIA BACTERIAL OUTER MEMBRANE VESICLES AND RESULTING VACCINE FORMULATIONS | [2006/32] | French: | METHODE D'INTRODUCTION D'ANTIGENES DANS DES VESICULES DE LA MEMBRANE EXTERNE DE BACTERIES NEISSERIA ET PREPARATIONS VACCINALES ASSOCIEES | [2006/32] | Entry into regional phase | 25.04.2006 | Translation filed | 25.04.2006 | National basic fee paid | 25.04.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.04.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.04.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/32] | 23.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/26] | 16.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2009 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0025811 (MICROBIOLOGICAL RES AUTHORITY [GB], et al); | [Y]WO0109350 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM BIOLOG [BE], et al); | [Y]WO0191788 (STATENS INST FOR FOLKEHELSE [NO], et al); | [Y]US2003059444 (ZOLLINGER WENDELL D [US], et al); | [XY]EP1297844 (MICROBIOLOGICAL RES AUTHORITY [GB]); | [Y]WO03051379 (HEALTH PROT AGENCY [GB], et al); | [PA]WO2004019977 (CHIRON SRL [IT], et al); |