EP1707002 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CONTROLLING THE INSERTION OF ADDITIONAL FIELDS OR FRAMES INTO A FIRST FORMAT PICTURE SEQUENCE IN ORDER TO CONSTRUCT THEREFROM A SECOND FORMAT PICTURE SEQUENCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.2009 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/40] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 46, quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HERPEL, Carsten Schwarze-Dorn-Str. 4 30974 Wennigsen / DE | 02 /
KEESEN, Heinz, Werner Siemensstr. 22 30173 Hannover / DE | 03 /
SCHEWZOW, Andrej Talaverastr. 14 30163 Hannover / DE | 04 /
WINTER, Marco Schneidermühler Weg 19 30659 Hannover / DE | [2006/50] |
Former [2006/40] | 01 /
HERPEL, Carsten Schwarze-Dorn-Str. 4 30974 Wennigsen / DE | ||
02 /
KEESEN, Heinz, Werner Siemensstr. 22 30173 Hannover / DE | |||
03 /
SCHEWZOW, Andrej Talaverastr. 14 30163 Hannover / DE | |||
04 /
WINTER, Marco Böhmerstr. 17 30173 Hannover / DE | Representative(s) | Hartnack, Wolfgang Deutsche Thomson OHG Karl-Wiechert-Allee 1D 30625 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Hartnack, Wolfgang Deutsche Thomson OHG European Patent Operations Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [2006/40] | Hartnack, Wolfgang Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH European Patent Operations Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 04797609.7 | 04.11.2004 | [2006/40] | WO2004EP12483 | Priority number, date | EP20040090021 | 21.01.2004 Original published format: EP 04090021 | [2006/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005071956 | Date: | 04.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1707002 | Date: | 04.10.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1707002 | Date: | 07.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/01 | [2006/40] | CPC: |
H04N7/01 (EP,US);
G11B27/10 (EP,US);
G11B27/105 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2562 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/17] |
Former [2006/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG DES EINFÜGENS ZUSÄTZLICHER FELDER ODER EINZELBILDER IN EINE BILDSEQUENZ EINES ERSTEN FORMATS, UM DARAUS EINE BILDSEQUENZ EINES ZWEITEN FORMATS ZU KONSTRUIEREN | [2006/40] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CONTROLLING THE INSERTION OF ADDITIONAL FIELDS OR FRAMES INTO A FIRST FORMAT PICTURE SEQUENCE IN ORDER TO CONSTRUCT THEREFROM A SECOND FORMAT PICTURE SEQUENCE | [2006/40] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE COMMANDER L'INSERTION DE TRAMES OU D'IMAGES ADDITIONNELLES DANS UNE SEQUENCE D'IMAGES POUR EN CHANGER LE FORMAT | [2006/40] | Entry into regional phase | 05.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 05.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/40] | 28.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9952281 (MIRANDA TECHNOLOGIES INC [CA], et al) [A] 1-11 * page 4, line 10 - line 19 * * page 5, line 1 - line 22 *; | [A]US2002047937 (WELLS NICHOLAS DOMINIC [GB]) [A] 1,2,10,11* paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0022] * |