EP1684586 - FUNGICIDAL MIXTURES FOR THE PREVENTION OF RICE PATHOGENS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.11.2008 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/10] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2006/31] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TORMO I BLASCO, Jordi Carl-Benz-Str.10-3 69514 Laudenbach / DE | 02 /
GROTE, Thomas Im Höhnhausen 18 67157 Wachenheim / DE | 03 /
SCHERER, Maria Hermann-Jürgens-Str.30 76829 Godramstein / DE | 04 /
STIERL, Reinhard Jahnstr.8 67251 Freinsheim / DE | 05 /
STRATHMANN, Siegfried Donnersbergstr.9 67117 Limburgerhof / DE | 06 /
SCHÖFL, Ulrich Erlenstr. 8 68782 Brühl / DE | [2006/31] | Application number, filing date | 04797634.5 | 05.11.2004 | [2006/31] | WO2004EP12513 | Priority number, date | DE2003152873 | 10.11.2003 Original published format: DE 10352873 | [2006/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005044009 | Date: | 19.05.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1684586 | Date: | 02.08.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/90 | [2006/31] | CPC: |
A01N43/90 (EP,KR,US)
| C-Set: |
A01N43/90, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N43/90, A01N43/653 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | 12.06.2006 | LT | 12.06.2006 | LV | 12.06.2006 | MK | Not yet paid | YU | 12.06.2006 | Title | German: | FUNGIZIDE MISCHUNGEN ZUR BEK MPFUNG VON REISPATHOGENEN | [2006/31] | English: | FUNGICIDAL MIXTURES FOR THE PREVENTION OF RICE PATHOGENS | [2006/31] | French: | MELANGES FONGICIDES SERVANT A LUTTER CONTRE DES AGENTS PATHOGENES DU RIZ | [2006/31] | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.05.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/31] | 22.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/52] | 07.08.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2008/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]WO9846607 (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO [US]) [DA] * page 18, line 12; example 2 *; | [DA]EP0988790 (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO [US]) [DA] * examples 39,40; claim 1 * |