EP1685439 - TRANSLATING BIFOCAL WEAR MODALITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 16.12.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2011 | Refusal of application | published on 18.01.2012 [2012/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/03] | For all designated states Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2006/31] | For:BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | ||
For:AT
Novartis Pharma GmbH Brunner Strasse 59 1230 Wien / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LINDACHER, Joseph, Michael 1115 Eagle Pointe Drive Lawrenceville, GA 30044 / US | [2006/31] | Representative(s) | Bohest AG Postfach 160 4003 Basel / CH | [2008/39] |
Former [2007/35] | Heinen, Detlef, et al BOHEST Intellectual Property A. Braun Braun Héritier Eschmann AG Holbeinstrasse 36-38 4051 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2006/31] | Crawley, Patrick Edward Novartis AG Corporate Intellectual Property 4002 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 04797836.6 | 11.11.2004 | [2006/31] | WO2004EP12812 | Priority number, date | US20030519145P | 12.11.2003 Original published format: US 519145 P | [2006/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005050291 | Date: | 02.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1685439 | Date: | 02.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G02C7/04 | [2006/31] | CPC: |
G02C7/048 (EP,US);
C07K1/22 (EP,US);
C07K5/101 (EP,US);
C07K5/1021 (EP,US);
G02C7/027 (EP,US);
G02C7/04 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÜBERSETZUNG DER BIFOKALEN ABNUTZUNGSMODALITÄT | [2006/31] | English: | TRANSLATING BIFOCAL WEAR MODALITY | [2006/31] | French: | TRANSLATION DE LA MODALITE DE PORT BIFOCAL | [2006/31] | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/31] | 10.07.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.10.2011 | 02.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2012/03] | 12.09.2011 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2012/03] | 11.10.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.04.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4324461 (SALVATORI ANTHONY L) [A] 1-26 * column 3, line 42 - column 4, line 54; figures 4,5 *; | [XY]EP0248489 (MILLER GREGORY N) [X] 1,23-26 * page 8, line 19 - line 27 * * page 9, line 1 - line 25; figures 3-7 * [Y] 2-22; | [XY]WO9109336 (SEIDNER LEONARD [US]) [X] 1,23-26 [Y] 2-22; | [A]EP0651276 (ECU LENS V O F [NL]) [A] 1-26 * column 4, line 5 - column 5, line 19; figures 1-7 *; | [A]US5724120 (SVOCHAK JAN B [US], et al) [A] 1-26* column 4, line 27 - line 45; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US6457826 (LETT JOHN B W [US]) [A] 1-26 * column 20, line 35 - column 21, line 23 *; | [PX]WO2004072710 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [PX] 1-26 * page 4, line 21 - page 9, line L; figures 1-3; claims 1-31 * | Examination | EP0996024 | WO0184216 |