Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
21.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.09.2009 [2009/39] |
10.04.2009 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
29.12.2008 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
16.10.2008 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
10.10.2008 | Change - classification | published on 12.11.2008 [2008/46] |
10.10.2008 | Change - classification | published on 12.11.2008 [2008/46] |
01.02.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 05.03.2008 [2008/10] |
08.12.2007 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
15.12.2006 | Change - extension states | published on 17.01.2007 [2007/03] |
08.12.2006 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
10.11.2006 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 13.12.2006 [2006/50] |
10.11.2006 | Request for examination filed | published on 13.12.2006 [2006/50] |
04.11.2006 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
04.08.2006 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
05.07.2006 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
05.07.2006 | New entry: Fee payment for extension state | |
15.07.2005 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
08.07.2005 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
26.02.2005 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
25.01.2005 | PCT data prior to European publication |