Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007202192 | Global Dossier | 30.08.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10356104 | 27.11.2003 | WO2004EP13066 | 18.11.2004 | DE102004012753 | 15.03.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2007513085 | Global Dossier | 24.05.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | DE10356104 | 27.11.2003 | WO2004EP13066 | 18.11.2004 | DE102004012753 | 15.03.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2004304676 | Global Dossier | 07.07.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10356104 | 27.11.2003 | WO2004EP13066 | 18.11.2004 | DE102004012753 | 15.03.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1729577 | Global Dossier | 13.12.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10356104 | 27.11.2003 | WO2004EP13066 | 18.11.2004 | DE102004012753 | 15.03.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0416939 | 13.02.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | DE10356104 | 27.11.2003 | WO2004EP13066 | 18.11.2004 | DE102004012753 | 15.03.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2545288 | 07.07.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10356104 | 27.11.2003 | WO2004EP13066 | 18.11.2004 | DE102004012753 | 15.03.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1886049 | 27.12.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | DE10356104 | 27.11.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EA200600966 | 27.10.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10356104 | 27.11.2003 | WO2004EP13066 | 18.11.2004 | DE102004012753 | 15.03.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO20062478L | 23.06.2006 | L | Priority number | Date | DE10356104 | 27.11.2003 | WO2004EP13066 | 18.11.2004 | DE102004012753 | 15.03.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | UA80370 | 10.09.2007 | C2 | Priority number | Date | DE10356104 | 27.11.2003 | WO2004EP13066 | 18.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA200605235 | 30.01.2008 | B | Priority number | Date | DE10356104 | 27.11.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005060752 | Global Dossier | 07.07.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10356104 | 27.11.2003 | DE102004012753 | 15.03.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20060113928 | Global Dossier | 03.11.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | DE10356104 | 27.11.2003 | DE102004012753 | 15.03.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR046722 | 21.12.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10356104 | 27.11.2003 | DE102004012753 | 15.03.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CO5680378 | 29.09.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE10356104 | 27.11.2003 | DE102004012753 | 15.03.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW200530240 | 16.09.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | DE10356104 | 27.11.2003 | DE102004012753 | 15.03.2004 |