EP1692326 - EQUIPMENT AND METHOD FOR REMOVING DEPOSITS CREATED IN ELECTROLYTIC REFINING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.04.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 22.07.2020 [2020/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OUTOTEC (FINLAND) OY Rauhalanpuisto 9 02230 Espoo / FI | [2017/18] |
Former [2017/16] | For all designated states OUTOTEC (FINLAND) OY Puolikkotie 10 02230 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2016/39] | For all designated states Outotec Oyj Rauhalanpuisto 9 02230 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2013/42] | For all designated states Outotec Oyj Puolikkotie 10 02230 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2007/34] | For all designated states Outotec Oyj Riihitontuntie 7 02200 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2006/48] | For all designated states Outokumpu Technology Oyj Riihitontuntie 7 02200 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2006/34] | For all designated states Outokumpu Technology Oy Riihitontuntie 7 02200 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NORD, Peter Klarälvsgatan 21 669 30 Deje / SE | 02 /
ANDERSSON, Rolf Kroppkärrsvägen 47 654 61 Karlstad / SE | [2006/34] | Representative(s) | K & H Bonapat Patentanwälte Koch · von Behren & Partner mbB Donnersbergerstraße 22A 80634 München / DE | [2018/24] |
Former [2013/07] | K & H Bonapat Patentanwälte Wotanstraße 64 80639 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/51] | Zipse Habersack Kritzenberger Patentanwälte Wotanstraße 64 80639 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/34] | Zipse + Habersack Wotanstrasse 64 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04798328.3 | 26.11.2004 | [2006/34] | WO2004FI00719 | Priority number, date | FI20030001752 | 01.12.2003 Original published format: FI 20031752 | [2006/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005054546 | Date: | 16.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1692326 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1692326 | Date: | 13.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 16.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C25C7/08 | [2006/34] | CPC: |
C25C7/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/24] |
Former [2006/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | 24.05.2006 | HR | 24.05.2006 | LT | 24.05.2006 | LV | 24.05.2006 | MK | 24.05.2006 | YU | 24.05.2006 | Title | German: | EINRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ENTFERNUNG VON ABLAGERUNGEN, DIE SICH BEI DER ELEKTROLYTISCHEN RAFFINATION BILDEN | [2006/34] | English: | EQUIPMENT AND METHOD FOR REMOVING DEPOSITS CREATED IN ELECTROLYTIC REFINING | [2006/34] | French: | EQUIPEMENT ET PROCEDE POUR L'ELIMINATION DE DEPOTS LAISSES PAR UN AFFINAGE ELECTROLYTIQUE | [2006/34] | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/34] | 03.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.05.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.08.2011 | Opposition(s) | 14.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 24.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.11.2004 | CY | 13.06.2018 | CZ | 13.06.2018 | DK | 13.06.2018 | EE | 13.06.2018 | FI | 13.06.2018 | IT | 13.06.2018 | MC | 13.06.2018 | NL | 13.06.2018 | PT | 13.06.2018 | RO | 13.06.2018 | SE | 13.06.2018 | SI | 13.06.2018 | SK | 13.06.2018 | TR | 13.06.2018 | GR | 14.09.2018 | IS | 13.10.2018 | GB | 26.11.2018 | IE | 26.11.2018 | LU | 26.11.2018 | CH | 30.11.2018 | FR | 30.11.2018 | LI | 30.11.2018 | [2020/30] |
Former [2020/27] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
IT | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PT | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
TR | 13.06.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
GB | 26.11.2018 | ||
IE | 26.11.2018 | ||
LU | 26.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
FR | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
IT | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
TR | 13.06.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
GB | 26.11.2018 | ||
IE | 26.11.2018 | ||
LU | 26.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
FR | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/03] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
IT | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
GB | 26.11.2018 | ||
IE | 26.11.2018 | ||
LU | 26.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
FR | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/49] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
IT | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
IE | 26.11.2018 | ||
LU | 26.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
FR | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
IT | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
IE | 26.11.2018 | ||
LU | 26.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/39] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
IT | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
LU | 26.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/34] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
IT | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
LU | 26.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
IT | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
IT | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
IT | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | FI | 13.06.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9635007 (WENMEC SYSTEMS AB [SE], et al); | [A]US4840710 (MIDDLIN BRUCE [AU], et al); | [A]WO0079029 (COPPER REFINERIES PTY LTD [AU], et al); | [A]FI47910B (NORDDEUTSCHE AFFINERIE) | Examination | US6079093 | by applicant | US6079093 | US4840710 |