EP1718848 - SILENCER FOR EXHAUST SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.03.2009 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 22.12.2010 [2010/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Emmett Limited 30 Parade Walk The Garrison Shoeburyness Essex SS3 9GE / GB | [2008/14] |
Former [2006/45] | For all designated states Emmett Limited 15 Pendlestone Benfleet, Essex SS7 1RT / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EMMETT, Malcom Douglas 11 St Clements Road Benfleet, Essex SS7 5XA / GB | [2006/45] | Representative(s) | Garner, Jonathan Charles Stapleton Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/45] | Garner, Jonathan Charles Stapleton FJ Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04798675.7 | 25.11.2004 | [2006/45] | WO2004GB04976 | Priority number, date | GB20030027401 | 25.11.2003 Original published format: GB 0327401 | [2006/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006056727 | Date: | 01.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1718848 | Date: | 08.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1718848 | Date: | 30.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F01N1/16, // F01N3/00 | [2007/19] | CPC: |
F01N1/165 (EP,US);
F01N3/005 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/45] | F01N1/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHALLDÄMPFER FÜR ABGASSYSTEME | [2006/45] | English: | SILENCER FOR EXHAUST SYSTEMS | [2006/45] | French: | SILENCIEUX POUR LES SYSTEMES D'ECHAPPEMENT | [2006/45] | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/45] | 21.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 07.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/15] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 07.12.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 07.12.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.01.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2007 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   14.03.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.04.2008 | BE | 30.04.2008 | CY | 30.04.2008 | CZ | 30.04.2008 | DK | 30.04.2008 | EE | 30.04.2008 | FI | 30.04.2008 | IT | 30.04.2008 | NL | 30.04.2008 | PL | 30.04.2008 | RO | 30.04.2008 | SI | 30.04.2008 | SK | 30.04.2008 | TR | 30.04.2008 | BG | 30.07.2008 | DE | 31.07.2008 | GR | 31.07.2008 | SE | 31.07.2008 | ES | 10.08.2008 | IS | 30.08.2008 | PT | 30.09.2008 | HU | 01.11.2008 | IE | 25.11.2008 | LU | 25.11.2008 | CH | 30.11.2008 | LI | 30.11.2008 | MC | 30.11.2008 | [2010/51] |
Former [2010/38] | AT | 30.04.2008 | |
BE | 30.04.2008 | ||
CY | 30.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2008 | ||
DK | 30.04.2008 | ||
EE | 30.04.2008 | ||
FI | 30.04.2008 | ||
IT | 30.04.2008 | ||
NL | 30.04.2008 | ||
PL | 30.04.2008 | ||
RO | 30.04.2008 | ||
SI | 30.04.2008 | ||
SK | 30.04.2008 | ||
TR | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 30.07.2008 | ||
DE | 31.07.2008 | ||
SE | 31.07.2008 | ||
ES | 10.08.2008 | ||
IS | 30.08.2008 | ||
PT | 30.09.2008 | ||
HU | 01.11.2008 | ||
IE | 25.11.2008 | ||
LU | 25.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/36] | AT | 30.04.2008 | |
BE | 30.04.2008 | ||
CY | 30.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2008 | ||
DK | 30.04.2008 | ||
EE | 30.04.2008 | ||
FI | 30.04.2008 | ||
IT | 30.04.2008 | ||
NL | 30.04.2008 | ||
PL | 30.04.2008 | ||
RO | 30.04.2008 | ||
SI | 30.04.2008 | ||
SK | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 30.07.2008 | ||
DE | 31.07.2008 | ||
SE | 31.07.2008 | ||
ES | 10.08.2008 | ||
IS | 30.08.2008 | ||
PT | 30.09.2008 | ||
HU | 01.11.2008 | ||
IE | 25.11.2008 | ||
LU | 25.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 30.04.2008 | |
BE | 30.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2008 | ||
DK | 30.04.2008 | ||
EE | 30.04.2008 | ||
FI | 30.04.2008 | ||
IT | 30.04.2008 | ||
NL | 30.04.2008 | ||
PL | 30.04.2008 | ||
RO | 30.04.2008 | ||
SI | 30.04.2008 | ||
SK | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 30.07.2008 | ||
DE | 31.07.2008 | ||
SE | 31.07.2008 | ||
ES | 10.08.2008 | ||
IS | 30.08.2008 | ||
PT | 30.09.2008 | ||
IE | 25.11.2008 | ||
LU | 25.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/51] | AT | 30.04.2008 | |
BE | 30.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2008 | ||
DK | 30.04.2008 | ||
EE | 30.04.2008 | ||
FI | 30.04.2008 | ||
IT | 30.04.2008 | ||
NL | 30.04.2008 | ||
PL | 30.04.2008 | ||
RO | 30.04.2008 | ||
SI | 30.04.2008 | ||
SK | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 30.07.2008 | ||
DE | 31.07.2008 | ||
SE | 31.07.2008 | ||
ES | 10.08.2008 | ||
IS | 30.08.2008 | ||
PT | 30.09.2008 | ||
IE | 25.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 30.04.2008 | |
BE | 30.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2008 | ||
DK | 30.04.2008 | ||
EE | 30.04.2008 | ||
FI | 30.04.2008 | ||
IT | 30.04.2008 | ||
NL | 30.04.2008 | ||
PL | 30.04.2008 | ||
RO | 30.04.2008 | ||
SI | 30.04.2008 | ||
SK | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 30.07.2008 | ||
DE | 31.07.2008 | ||
SE | 31.07.2008 | ||
ES | 10.08.2008 | ||
IS | 30.08.2008 | ||
PT | 30.09.2008 | ||
IE | 25.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/41] | AT | 30.04.2008 | |
BE | 30.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2008 | ||
DK | 30.04.2008 | ||
EE | 30.04.2008 | ||
FI | 30.04.2008 | ||
IT | 30.04.2008 | ||
NL | 30.04.2008 | ||
PL | 30.04.2008 | ||
RO | 30.04.2008 | ||
SI | 30.04.2008 | ||
SK | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 30.07.2008 | ||
DE | 31.07.2008 | ||
SE | 31.07.2008 | ||
ES | 10.08.2008 | ||
IS | 30.08.2008 | ||
PT | 30.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 30.04.2008 | |
BE | 30.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2008 | ||
DK | 30.04.2008 | ||
EE | 30.04.2008 | ||
FI | 30.04.2008 | ||
NL | 30.04.2008 | ||
PL | 30.04.2008 | ||
RO | 30.04.2008 | ||
SI | 30.04.2008 | ||
SK | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 30.07.2008 | ||
DE | 31.07.2008 | ||
SE | 31.07.2008 | ||
ES | 10.08.2008 | ||
IS | 30.08.2008 | ||
PT | 30.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 30.04.2008 | |
BE | 30.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2008 | ||
DK | 30.04.2008 | ||
EE | 30.04.2008 | ||
FI | 30.04.2008 | ||
NL | 30.04.2008 | ||
PL | 30.04.2008 | ||
RO | 30.04.2008 | ||
SI | 30.04.2008 | ||
SK | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 30.07.2008 | ||
DE | 31.07.2008 | ||
SE | 31.07.2008 | ||
ES | 10.08.2008 | ||
IS | 30.08.2008 | ||
PT | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 30.04.2008 | |
BE | 30.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2008 | ||
DK | 30.04.2008 | ||
EE | 30.04.2008 | ||
FI | 30.04.2008 | ||
NL | 30.04.2008 | ||
PL | 30.04.2008 | ||
RO | 30.04.2008 | ||
SI | 30.04.2008 | ||
SK | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 30.07.2008 | ||
SE | 31.07.2008 | ||
ES | 10.08.2008 | ||
IS | 30.08.2008 | ||
PT | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 30.04.2008 | |
BE | 30.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2008 | ||
DK | 30.04.2008 | ||
FI | 30.04.2008 | ||
NL | 30.04.2008 | ||
PL | 30.04.2008 | ||
RO | 30.04.2008 | ||
SI | 30.04.2008 | ||
SK | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 30.07.2008 | ||
SE | 31.07.2008 | ||
ES | 10.08.2008 | ||
IS | 30.08.2008 | ||
PT | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | AT | 30.04.2008 | |
DK | 30.04.2008 | ||
FI | 30.04.2008 | ||
NL | 30.04.2008 | ||
PL | 30.04.2008 | ||
SI | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 30.07.2008 | ||
SE | 31.07.2008 | ||
ES | 10.08.2008 | ||
IS | 30.08.2008 | ||
PT | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 30.04.2008 | |
FI | 30.04.2008 | ||
NL | 30.04.2008 | ||
PL | 30.04.2008 | ||
SI | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 30.07.2008 | ||
SE | 31.07.2008 | ||
ES | 10.08.2008 | ||
IS | 30.08.2008 | ||
PT | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/05] | AT | 30.04.2008 | |
FI | 30.04.2008 | ||
NL | 30.04.2008 | ||
PL | 30.04.2008 | ||
SI | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 30.07.2008 | ||
ES | 10.08.2008 | ||
IS | 30.08.2008 | ||
PT | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 30.04.2008 | |
FI | 30.04.2008 | ||
NL | 30.04.2008 | ||
PL | 30.04.2008 | ||
SI | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 30.07.2008 | ||
ES | 10.08.2008 | ||
PT | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | NL | 30.04.2008 | |
SI | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 30.07.2008 | ||
ES | 10.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 30.04.2008 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS6019907 ; | [X]DE2110000 (PAUL GILLET GMBH) [X] 1,2,4,24,25,27 * column 3, line 14 - column 4, line 19; figure 2 *; | [X]US3718208 (GIBEL S) [X] 1,2,4,24,25,27 * column 1, line 58 - columns 3-24; figure 2 *; | [X]JPS6019907 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1,4,24,27 * abstract *; | [X]US4901528 (SAIGO FUMITAKA [JP], et al) [X] 1,4,24,27 * abstract *; | [A]US5279117 (KAISER FRIEDRICH W [DE]) [A] 1,6,7,11,13,24,29,30,34,36* abstract *; | [X]DE4323644 (HATZ MOTOREN [DE]) [X] 1,24 * column 2, line 20 - column 2, line 28 *; | [X]EP0710767 (CALSONIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,24,25,27 * abstract *; | [X]US5747753 (EDER ERICH [DE]) [X] 1,24 * column 2, line 21 - column 2, line 46; figures 1,2 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850614), vol. 009, no. 139, Database accession no. (M - 387), & JP60019907 A 19850201 (TOYOTA JIDOSHA KK) [X] 1,24 * abstract * |