EP1685752 - COOLING STRUCTURE OF ELECTRIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.12.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.01.2009 [2009/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | [2008/07] |
Former [2006/31] | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OHNISHI, Kenichi Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471 8571 / JP | 02 /
TORII, Koshi Denso Corporation, 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-city, Aichi-Pref 448-8661 / JP | [2006/31] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [2006/31] | Kuhnen & Wacker Intellectual Property Law Firm Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 04798802.7 | 09.11.2004 | [2006/31] | WO2004IB03659 | Priority number, date | JP20030388069 | 18.11.2003 Original published format: JP 2003388069 | [2006/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005051063 | Date: | 02.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1685752 | Date: | 02.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1685752 | Date: | 13.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H05K7/14, H05K7/20, H02M7/00 | [2006/31] | CPC: |
H05K7/20927 (EP,US);
H05K7/20 (KR);
H02M7/003 (EP,US);
H05K7/14 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/08] |
Former [2006/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KÜHLSTRUKTUR EINES ELEKTRISCHEN GERÄTS | [2006/31] | English: | COOLING STRUCTURE OF ELECTRIC DEVICE | [2006/31] | French: | STRUCTURE DE REFROIDISSEMENT POUR DISPOSITIF ELECTRIQUE | [2006/31] | Entry into regional phase | 11.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 11.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/31] | 11.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]GB887563 (WESTINGHOUSE BRAKE & SIGNAL, et al) [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 2,3; | [ADY]JP2001245478 ; | [A]EP1067831 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0688053 (ABB MANAGEMENT AG [CH]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US6166937 (YAMAMURA HIROHISA [JP], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2003243865 | [ADY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020701), vol. 2000, no. 26, & JP2001245478 A 20010907 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [AD] 1 * abstract * [Y] 2,3 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031205), vol. 2003, no. 12, & JP2003243865 A 20030829 (TOYOTA INDUSTRIES CORP; AISIN AW CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |