EP1684643 - PRECISION SPINDLE INSTRUMENT HOLDER FOR SURGICAL INSTRUMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.05.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.06.2008 [2008/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PRECIMED S.A. l'Echelette, 7 2534 Orvin / CH | [2006/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DESARZENS, Yves Grand-Rue 12 CH-2606 Corgémont / CH | 02 /
LECHOT, André L'Eaubelle 24 CH-2534 Orvin / CH | [2006/31] | Representative(s) | Mötteli-Mantelli, Novella Da Vinci Partners LLC Rathausgasse 1 9320 Arbon / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2006/31] | Mötteli-Mantelli, Novella c/o Moetteli & Associés SàRL, St. Leonhardstrasse 4 9000 St. Gallen / CH | Application number, filing date | 04798824.1 | 10.11.2004 | [2006/31] | WO2004IB03684 | Priority number, date | US20030518769P | 10.11.2003 Original published format: US 518769 P | [2006/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005044114 | Date: | 19.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1684643 | Date: | 02.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/16 | [2006/31] | CPC: |
A61B17/1666 (EP);
A61B17/1617 (EP);
A61B17/162 (EP);
A61B2017/00477 (EP);
A61B2090/0813 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PRÄZISIONSSPINDELINSTRUMENTEN-HALTER FÜR EIN OPERATIONSINSTRUMENT | [2006/31] | English: | PRECISION SPINDLE INSTRUMENT HOLDER FOR SURGICAL INSTRUMENT | [2006/31] | French: | PORTE-INSTRUMENT A BROCHE DE PRECISION POUR INSTRUMENT CHIRURGICAL | [2006/31] | Entry into regional phase | 09.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 09.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.08.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.05.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/31] | 19.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/24] | 18.01.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2008/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2007 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]US6264647 (LECHOT ANDRE [CH]) [DA] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [DA]US5658290 (LECHOT ANDRE [CH]) [DA] 1-23 * the whole document * |