EP1720425 - AUXILIARY ACCESSORY FOR THE CHOICE OF A HAIRSTYLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.04.2009 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mastropietro, Marina Via Belisario, 4 20100 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2006/46] | For all designated states Mastropietro, Marina Via Bellsario, 4 20100 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROTONDI, Pierpaolo Renzo Via Beatrice D`Este 30 20100 Milano / IT | 02 /
MASTROPIETRO, Marina Via Belisario 4 20100 Milano / IT | [2008/38] |
Former [2006/46] | 01 /
ROTONDI, Pierpaolo Renzo Via Beatrice D`Este 30 20100 Milano / IT | ||
02 /
MASTROPIETRO, Marina Via Bellisario 4 20100 Milano / IT | Representative(s) | Marietti, Andrea Marietti, Gislon e Trupiano S.r.l. Via Larga, 16 20122 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2006/46] | Marietti, Andrea Marietti, Gislon e Trupiano S.r.l. Via Larga, 16 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 04798956.1 | 24.11.2004 | [2006/46] | WO2004IB03844 | Priority number, date | IT2003MI00553U | 27.11.2003 Original published format: IT MI20030553 U | [2006/46] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005051118 | Date: | 09.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1720425 | Date: | 15.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1720425 | Date: | 04.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A45D44/00, A45D8/36 | [2006/46] | CPC: |
A45D44/005 (EP,US);
A45D8/36 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/46] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HILFSZUBEHÖR ZUR AUSWAHL EINES HAARSTILS | [2006/46] | English: | AUXILIARY ACCESSORY FOR THE CHOICE OF A HAIRSTYLE | [2006/46] | French: | ACCESSOIRE POUR LE CHOIX D'UNE COIFFURE | [2006/46] | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2005 | Translation filed | 27.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/46] | 04.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2007 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   18.04.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 04.06.2008 | RO | 04.06.2008 | TR | 04.06.2008 | BG | 04.09.2008 | GR | 05.09.2008 | IS | 04.10.2008 | PT | 04.11.2008 | AT | 24.11.2008 | CZ | 24.11.2008 | FI | 24.11.2008 | GB | 24.11.2008 | IE | 24.11.2008 | IT | 24.11.2008 | LU | 24.11.2008 | PL | 24.11.2008 | SK | 24.11.2008 | ES | 25.11.2008 | HU | 25.11.2008 | SE | 25.11.2008 | SI | 25.11.2008 | BE | 30.11.2008 | CH | 30.11.2008 | DK | 30.11.2008 | EE | 30.11.2008 | FR | 30.11.2008 | LI | 30.11.2008 | MC | 30.11.2008 | [2011/45] |
Former [2010/51] | CY | 04.06.2008 | |
RO | 04.06.2008 | ||
TR | 04.06.2008 | ||
BG | 04.09.2008 | ||
GR | 05.09.2008 | ||
IS | 04.10.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
AT | 24.11.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2008 | ||
FI | 24.11.2008 | ||
GB | 24.11.2008 | ||
IE | 24.11.2008 | ||
IT | 24.11.2008 | ||
LU | 24.11.2008 | ||
PL | 24.11.2008 | ||
SK | 24.11.2008 | ||
ES | 25.11.2008 | ||
HU | 25.11.2008 | ||
SE | 25.11.2008 | ||
SI | 25.11.2008 | ||
BE | 30.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
DK | 30.11.2008 | ||
EE | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/38] | CY | 04.06.2008 | |
RO | 04.06.2008 | ||
TR | 04.06.2008 | ||
BG | 04.09.2008 | ||
IS | 04.10.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
AT | 24.11.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2008 | ||
FI | 24.11.2008 | ||
GB | 24.11.2008 | ||
IE | 24.11.2008 | ||
IT | 24.11.2008 | ||
LU | 24.11.2008 | ||
PL | 24.11.2008 | ||
SK | 24.11.2008 | ||
ES | 25.11.2008 | ||
HU | 25.11.2008 | ||
SE | 25.11.2008 | ||
SI | 25.11.2008 | ||
BE | 30.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
DK | 30.11.2008 | ||
EE | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/36] | CY | 04.06.2008 | |
RO | 04.06.2008 | ||
BG | 04.09.2008 | ||
IS | 04.10.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
AT | 24.11.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2008 | ||
FI | 24.11.2008 | ||
GB | 24.11.2008 | ||
IE | 24.11.2008 | ||
IT | 24.11.2008 | ||
LU | 24.11.2008 | ||
PL | 24.11.2008 | ||
SK | 24.11.2008 | ||
ES | 25.11.2008 | ||
HU | 25.11.2008 | ||
SE | 25.11.2008 | ||
SI | 25.11.2008 | ||
BE | 30.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
DK | 30.11.2008 | ||
EE | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | RO | 04.06.2008 | |
BG | 04.09.2008 | ||
IS | 04.10.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
AT | 24.11.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2008 | ||
FI | 24.11.2008 | ||
GB | 24.11.2008 | ||
IE | 24.11.2008 | ||
IT | 24.11.2008 | ||
LU | 24.11.2008 | ||
PL | 24.11.2008 | ||
SK | 24.11.2008 | ||
ES | 25.11.2008 | ||
HU | 25.11.2008 | ||
SE | 25.11.2008 | ||
SI | 25.11.2008 | ||
BE | 30.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
DK | 30.11.2008 | ||
EE | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/31] | RO | 04.06.2008 | |
BG | 04.09.2008 | ||
IS | 04.10.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
AT | 24.11.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2008 | ||
FI | 24.11.2008 | ||
GB | 24.11.2008 | ||
IE | 24.11.2008 | ||
IT | 24.11.2008 | ||
PL | 24.11.2008 | ||
SK | 24.11.2008 | ||
ES | 25.11.2008 | ||
HU | 25.11.2008 | ||
SE | 25.11.2008 | ||
SI | 25.11.2008 | ||
BE | 30.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
DK | 30.11.2008 | ||
EE | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/19] | RO | 04.06.2008 | |
BG | 04.09.2008 | ||
IS | 04.10.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
AT | 24.11.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2008 | ||
FI | 24.11.2008 | ||
GB | 24.11.2008 | ||
IE | 24.11.2008 | ||
IT | 24.11.2008 | ||
PL | 24.11.2008 | ||
SK | 24.11.2008 | ||
ES | 25.11.2008 | ||
HU | 25.11.2008 | ||
SI | 25.11.2008 | ||
BE | 30.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
DK | 30.11.2008 | ||
EE | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/11] | RO | 04.06.2008 | |
BG | 04.09.2008 | ||
IS | 04.10.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
AT | 24.11.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2008 | ||
FI | 24.11.2008 | ||
GB | 24.11.2008 | ||
IE | 24.11.2008 | ||
IT | 24.11.2008 | ||
PL | 24.11.2008 | ||
SK | 24.11.2008 | ||
HU | 25.11.2008 | ||
SI | 25.11.2008 | ||
BE | 30.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
DK | 30.11.2008 | ||
EE | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/01] | RO | 04.06.2008 | |
BG | 04.09.2008 | ||
IS | 04.10.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2008 | ||
FI | 24.11.2008 | ||
GB | 24.11.2008 | ||
IE | 24.11.2008 | ||
IT | 24.11.2008 | ||
SK | 24.11.2008 | ||
HU | 25.11.2008 | ||
SI | 25.11.2008 | ||
BE | 30.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
DK | 30.11.2008 | ||
EE | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/51] | RO | 04.06.2008 | |
BG | 04.09.2008 | ||
IS | 04.10.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2008 | ||
FI | 24.11.2008 | ||
IE | 24.11.2008 | ||
IT | 24.11.2008 | ||
SK | 24.11.2008 | ||
HU | 25.11.2008 | ||
SI | 25.11.2008 | ||
BE | 30.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
DK | 30.11.2008 | ||
EE | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/47] | RO | 04.06.2008 | |
BG | 04.09.2008 | ||
IS | 04.10.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2008 | ||
FI | 24.11.2008 | ||
IE | 24.11.2008 | ||
IT | 24.11.2008 | ||
SK | 24.11.2008 | ||
BE | 30.11.2008 | ||
DK | 30.11.2008 | ||
EE | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/46] | RO | 04.06.2008 | |
BG | 04.09.2008 | ||
IS | 04.10.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2008 | ||
FI | 24.11.2008 | ||
IT | 24.11.2008 | ||
SK | 24.11.2008 | ||
BE | 30.11.2008 | ||
DK | 30.11.2008 | ||
EE | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/44] | RO | 04.06.2008 | |
BG | 04.09.2008 | ||
IS | 04.10.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2008 | ||
FI | 24.11.2008 | ||
IT | 24.11.2008 | ||
SK | 24.11.2008 | ||
BE | 30.11.2008 | ||
EE | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/41] | RO | 04.06.2008 | |
BG | 04.09.2008 | ||
IS | 04.10.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2008 | ||
FI | 24.11.2008 | ||
IT | 24.11.2008 | ||
EE | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/36] | RO | 04.06.2008 | |
BG | 04.09.2008 | ||
IS | 04.10.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
FI | 24.11.2008 | ||
EE | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | RO | 04.06.2008 | |
BG | 04.09.2008 | ||
IS | 04.10.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/24] | RO | 04.06.2008 | |
BG | 04.09.2008 | ||
IS | 04.10.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/17] | RO | 04.06.2008 | |
IS | 04.10.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/10] | IS | 04.10.2008 | |
PT | 04.11.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5337763 (HABER JUDY [US], et al) [A] 1-8* the whole document *; | [AY]US5806535 (BECKER GOLDIA L [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 1 - line 57; figure -; claim - * [Y] 4; | [DXY]USD465615S (BRUNELLE LORIE J [CA]) [DX] 1-3,5,6 * the whole document * [Y] 4 |