EP1688015 - ELECTRO-ACOUSTIC TRANSDUCER COMPRISING AN ELECTRONIC CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/32] | ELECTRO-ACOUSTIC TRANSDUCER COMPRISING AN RFID CIRCUIT | ||
[2010/38] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2007/31] |
Former [2006/32] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHEUCHER, Heimo Triester Strasse 64 A-1101 Vienna / AT | [2006/32] | Representative(s) | Schouten, Marcus Maria, et al NXP B.V. Intellectual Property & Licensing High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/42] | Schouten, Marcus Maria, et al NXP B.V. IP & L Department High Tech Campus 32 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2007/07] | Röggla, Harald, et al NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Department Gutheil-Schoder-Gasse 8-12 1101 Vienna / AT | ||
Former [2007/01] | Röggla, Harald, et al NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Department Triester Strasse 64 1101 Vienna / AT | ||
Former [2006/32] | Röggla, Harald Philips Austria GmbH Intellectual Property & Standards, Triester Strasse 64 1101 Vienna / AT | Application number, filing date | 04799132.8 | 12.11.2004 | [2006/32] | WO2004IB52402 | Priority number, date | EP20030104197 | 14.11.2003 Original published format: EP 03104197 | [2006/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005048652 | Date: | 26.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1688015 | Date: | 09.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1688015 | Date: | 09.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04R9/06 | [2010/38] | CPC: |
H04R9/06 (EP,US);
H04R1/06 (EP,US);
H04R31/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/32] | H04R9/06, H04Q7/32 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTROAKUSTISCHER WANDLER MIT EINER ELEKTRONISCHEN SCHALTUNG | [2010/38] | English: | ELECTRO-ACOUSTIC TRANSDUCER COMPRISING AN ELECTRONIC CIRCUIT | [2010/38] | French: | TRANSDUCTEUR ELECTROACOUSTIQUE COMPORTANT UN CIRCUIT ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2010/38] |
Former [2006/32] | ELEKTROAKUSTISCHER WANDLER MIT EINER RFID-SCHALTUNG | ||
Former [2006/32] | ELECTRO-ACOUSTIC TRANSDUCER COMPRISING AN RFID CIRCUIT | ||
Former [2006/32] | TRANSDUCTEUR ELECTROACOUSTIQUE COMPORTANT UN CIRCUIT D'IDENTIFICATION PAR RADIOFREQUENCE | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/32] | 12.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.03.2011 | BE | 09.03.2011 | CY | 09.03.2011 | CZ | 09.03.2011 | DK | 09.03.2011 | EE | 09.03.2011 | FI | 09.03.2011 | HU | 09.03.2011 | IT | 09.03.2011 | NL | 09.03.2011 | PL | 09.03.2011 | RO | 09.03.2011 | SE | 09.03.2011 | SI | 09.03.2011 | SK | 09.03.2011 | TR | 09.03.2011 | BG | 09.06.2011 | GR | 10.06.2011 | ES | 20.06.2011 | IS | 09.07.2011 | PT | 11.07.2011 | IE | 12.11.2011 | LU | 12.11.2011 | CH | 30.11.2011 | LI | 30.11.2011 | MC | 30.11.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
BE | 09.03.2011 | ||
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2011 | ||
DK | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
IT | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
PL | 09.03.2011 | ||
RO | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SK | 09.03.2011 | ||
TR | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
IS | 09.07.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
IE | 12.11.2011 | ||
LU | 12.11.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
BE | 09.03.2011 | ||
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2011 | ||
DK | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
IT | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
PL | 09.03.2011 | ||
RO | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SK | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
IS | 09.07.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
IE | 12.11.2011 | ||
LU | 12.11.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
BE | 09.03.2011 | ||
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2011 | ||
DK | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
IT | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
PL | 09.03.2011 | ||
RO | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SK | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
IS | 09.07.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
IE | 12.11.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/33] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
BE | 09.03.2011 | ||
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2011 | ||
DK | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
IT | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
PL | 09.03.2011 | ||
RO | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SK | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
IS | 09.07.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/29] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
BE | 09.03.2011 | ||
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2011 | ||
DK | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
IT | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
PL | 09.03.2011 | ||
RO | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SK | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
IS | 09.07.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
BE | 09.03.2011 | ||
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2011 | ||
DK | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
IT | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
PL | 09.03.2011 | ||
RO | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SK | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
IS | 09.07.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
BE | 09.03.2011 | ||
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2011 | ||
DK | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
PL | 09.03.2011 | ||
RO | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SK | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
IS | 09.07.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
BE | 09.03.2011 | ||
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2011 | ||
DK | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
RO | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SK | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
IS | 09.07.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
BE | 09.03.2011 | ||
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
RO | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SK | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
IS | 09.07.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
BE | 09.03.2011 | ||
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/41] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
BE | 09.03.2011 | ||
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/39] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 09.03.2011 | |
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | SE | 09.03.2011 | |
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | Cited in | International search | [XA]JPH09307955 ; | [A]JP2000298485 ; | [DA]US6243472 (BILAN FRANK ALBERT [US], et al) [DA] 1* abstract *; | [AD]WO0251183 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [AD] 1 * abstract * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980227), vol. 1998, no. 03, & JP09307955 A 19971128 (FUNAI DENKI KENKYUSHO:KK) [X] 1,2,4-6 * the whole document * [A] 3 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010205), vol. 2000, no. 13, & JP2000298485 A 20001024 (CITIZEN ELECTRONICS CO LTD) [A] 3,5 * abstract * |