EP1684281 - OPTICAL INFORMATION RECORDING MEDIUM, OPTICAL INFORMATION RECORDING MEDIUM RECORDING/REPRODUCING METHOD, AND RECORDING/REPRODUCING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.01.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.02.2010 [2010/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2006/30] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHIKIORI, Keiji // / / JP | 02 /
OHNO, Eiji // / / JP | 03 /
HINO, Yasumori // / / JP | [2006/30] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ, Günther Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/30] | Eisenführ, Günther Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 04799416.5 | 01.11.2004 | [2006/30] | WO2004JP16210 | Priority number, date | JP20030378262 | 07.11.2003 Original published format: JP 2003378262 | [2006/30] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005045818 | Date: | 19.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1684281 | Date: | 26.07.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.05.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/24, G11B7/004 | [2006/30] | CPC: |
G11B7/2403 (EP,US);
G11B7/24065 (KR);
G11B7/256 (EP,US);
G11B7/00736 (EP,US);
G11B7/24094 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTISCHES INFORMATIONSAUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM, AUFZEICHNUNGS-/WIEDERGABEVERFAHREN FÜR EIN OPTISCHES INFORMATIONSAUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM UND AUFZEICHNUNGS-/WIEDERGABEVORRICHTUNG | [2006/30] | English: | OPTICAL INFORMATION RECORDING MEDIUM, OPTICAL INFORMATION RECORDING MEDIUM RECORDING/REPRODUCING METHOD, AND RECORDING/REPRODUCING APPARATUS | [2006/30] | French: | SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT OPTIQUE D'INFORMATIONS, PROCEDE D'ENREGISTREMENT/DE REPRODUCTION DE SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT OPTIQUE D'INFORMATIONS, ET APPAREIL D'ENREGISTREMENT/DE REPRODUCTION | [2006/30] | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.2006 | Translation filed | 07.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 07.06.2006 | Search fee paid | 07.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.09.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 07.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/30] | 08.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/06] | 23.09.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2009 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0713784 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,4,13-16,18,19* the whole document *; | [XA]US2002191517 (HONDA KAZUHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1,4,13-17 * paragraphs [0030] - [0047]; figures 2,6-10 * [A] 5-12,18,19 | International search | [X]JP2003263780 (TDK CORP, et al); | [X]JP2003296969 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [X]JP2003203387 (LINTEC CORP, et al); | [X]WO03003361 (SONY CORP [JP], et al); | [X]JP2003303443 (RICOH KK); | [X]JP2003006930 (SONY CORP); | [X]JP2003300384 (RICOH KK); | [X]JP2003022569 (SONY CORP) |