EP1692275 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR PREPARING STEM CELLS FROM FAT TISSUE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biomaster, Inc. Yokohama Excellent 3, 8F 3-35 Minaminakadori Naka-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 231-0006 / JP | [2010/47] |
Former [2006/34] | For all designated states Biomaster Inc. The Imperial Hotel Tower 12F, 1-1-1, Uchisaiwaicho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIMURA, Kotaro 1-3-9, Hiroo, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 1500012 / JP | 02 /
MATSUMOTO, Daisuke 735-4, Oojima, Yaizu-shi Shizuoka 425-0066 / JP | [2010/45] |
Former [2006/34] | 01 /
YOSHIMURA, Kotaro 1-3-9, Hiroo, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 1500012 / JP | ||
02 /
MATSUMOTO, Daisuke 1-7-5-203, Uenosakuragi, Taito-ku Tokyo 1100002 / JP | Representative(s) | Harding, Charles Thomas D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/34] | Harding, Charles Thomas D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 04799610.3 | 04.11.2004 | [2006/34] | WO2004JP16717 | Priority number, date | JP20030375026 | 04.11.2003 Original published format: JP 2003375026 | JP20040039099 | 16.02.2004 Original published format: JP 2004039099 | [2006/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005042730 | Date: | 12.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1692275 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1692275 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/0775, A61K35/12, A61P19/00 | [2010/21] | CPC: |
C12N5/0667 (EP,US);
C12N5/0662 (KR);
A61K35/12 (EP,KR,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P13/00 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P5/00 (EP);
A61P7/04 (EP);
A61P7/06 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2006/34] | C12N5/08, A61K35/12, A61P19/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON STAMMZELLEN AUS FETTGEWEBE | [2006/34] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR PREPARING STEM CELLS FROM FAT TISSUE | [2006/34] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME POUR PREPARER DES CELLULES SOUCHES A PARTIR DE TISSUS GRAS | [2006/34] | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/34] | 06.06.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.12.2010 | BE | 29.12.2010 | CY | 29.12.2010 | CZ | 29.12.2010 | DK | 29.12.2010 | EE | 29.12.2010 | FI | 29.12.2010 | HU | 29.12.2010 | IT | 29.12.2010 | NL | 29.12.2010 | PL | 29.12.2010 | RO | 29.12.2010 | SE | 29.12.2010 | SI | 29.12.2010 | SK | 29.12.2010 | TR | 29.12.2010 | BG | 29.03.2011 | GR | 30.03.2011 | ES | 09.04.2011 | IS | 29.04.2011 | PT | 29.04.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 29.12.2010 | |
BE | 29.12.2010 | ||
CY | 29.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
DK | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
IT | 29.12.2010 | ||
NL | 29.12.2010 | ||
PL | 29.12.2010 | ||
RO | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
TR | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 29.12.2010 | |
BE | 29.12.2010 | ||
CY | 29.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
DK | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
IT | 29.12.2010 | ||
NL | 29.12.2010 | ||
PL | 29.12.2010 | ||
RO | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 29.12.2010 | |
BE | 29.12.2010 | ||
CY | 29.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
DK | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
NL | 29.12.2010 | ||
PL | 29.12.2010 | ||
RO | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 29.12.2010 | |
BE | 29.12.2010 | ||
CY | 29.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
NL | 29.12.2010 | ||
PL | 29.12.2010 | ||
RO | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | AT | 29.12.2010 | |
BE | 29.12.2010 | ||
CY | 29.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
PL | 29.12.2010 | ||
RO | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | AT | 29.12.2010 | |
BE | 29.12.2010 | ||
CY | 29.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
PL | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 29.12.2010 | |
BE | 29.12.2010 | ||
CY | 29.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/32] | AT | 29.12.2010 | |
BE | 29.12.2010 | ||
CY | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | CY | 29.12.2010 | |
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | Cited in | International search | [XD]WO0053795 (UNIV PITTSBURGH [US], et al) [XD] 14-25,31-39,42,43,45,48-72 * the whole document *; | [XD]WO0162901 (ARTECEL SCIENCES INC [US], et al) [XD] 1-72 * the whole document *; | [XD]WO03022988 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) [XD] 14-39,42,43,45,48-72 * examples 1,8-10 *; | [E]WO2005035738 (BIOMASTER INC [JP], et al) [E] 1-72* page 41 - page 42; example 2 *; | [XD] - ZUK P A ET AL, "Multilineage cells from human adipose tissue: Implications for cell-based therapies", TISSUE ENGINEERING, (200104), vol. 7, no. 2, ISSN 1076-3279, pages 211 - 228, XP002198710 [XD] 14-39,42,43,45,48-72 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/107632701300062859 | [X] - GIMBLE J M GUILAK F, "Adipose-derived adult stem cells: Isolation, characterization, and differentiation potential", CYTOTHERAPY, (2003), vol. 5, no. 5, ISSN 1465-3249, pages 362 - 369, XP009034648 [X] 32-39,45,48-72 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/14653240310003026 | [A] - GRONTHOS S ET AL, "Integrin-mediated interactions between human bone marrow stromal precursor cells and the extracellular matrix", BONE, (200102), vol. 28, no. 2, ISSN 8756-3282, pages 174 - 181, XP002904586 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S8756-3282(00)00424-5 | Examination | - GRONTHOS S ET AL., "surface Protein Characterization of Human Adipose Tissue-Derived Stromal Cells", JOURNAL OF CELLULAR PHYSIOLOGY, (200110), vol. 189, no. 1, pages 54 - 63 | - MITCHELL J B ET AL., "Immunophenotype of Human Adipose-Derived Cells: Temporal Changes in Stromal-Associated and Stem Cell-Associated Markers", STEM CELLS, (200602), vol. 24, no. 2, pages 376 - 385 | - WAGNER W & HO A D, "Mesenchymal Stem Cell Preparations--Comparing Apples and Oranges", STEM CELL REVIEWS, (200712), vol. 3, no. 4, pages 239 - 248 |