EP1697199 - DEVICE FOR ACTIVITIES ON SNOW, WATER OR THE LIKE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.12.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 22.12.2010 [2010/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Knarvik, Jonas Min Ola Narr 14 0563 Oslo / NO | [2006/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/36] | Representative(s) | Briddes, Sam Onsagers Ltd c/o Innovation Norway Charles House 5 Lower Regent Street, London SW1Y 4LR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/36] | Briddes, Sam Onsagers Ltd c/o Innovation Norway 5 Lower Regent Street London SW1Y 4LR / GB | Application number, filing date | 04800193.7 | 12.11.2004 | [2006/36] | WO2004NO00345 | Priority number, date | NO20030005024 | 12.11.2003 Original published format: NO 20035024 | [2006/36] | Filing language | NO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005047075 | Date: | 26.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1697199 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1697199 | Date: | 13.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 26.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B62B15/00 | [2006/36] | CPC: |
B62B15/00 (EP,US);
B63B32/51 (US);
B63B34/54 (EP);
B63B34/52 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG FÜR AKTIVITÄTEN AUF SCHNEE, WASSER ODER DERGLEICHEN | [2006/36] | English: | DEVICE FOR ACTIVITIES ON SNOW, WATER OR THE LIKE | [2006/36] | French: | DISPOSITIF UTILISE DANS DES ACTIVITES SUR LA NEIGE, L'EAU OU ANALOGUE | [2006/36] | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/36] | 07.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 13.02.2008 | CY | 13.02.2008 | CZ | 13.02.2008 | DK | 13.02.2008 | EE | 13.02.2008 | NL | 13.02.2008 | PL | 13.02.2008 | RO | 13.02.2008 | SI | 13.02.2008 | SK | 13.02.2008 | TR | 13.02.2008 | BG | 13.05.2008 | GR | 14.05.2008 | IS | 13.06.2008 | PT | 14.07.2008 | HU | 14.08.2008 | GB | 12.11.2008 | IE | 12.11.2008 | LU | 12.11.2008 | [2010/51] |
Former [2010/38] | BE | 13.02.2008 | |
CY | 13.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
TR | 13.02.2008 | ||
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
HU | 14.08.2008 | ||
GB | 12.11.2008 | ||
IE | 12.11.2008 | ||
LU | 12.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/36] | BE | 13.02.2008 | |
CY | 13.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
HU | 14.08.2008 | ||
GB | 12.11.2008 | ||
IE | 12.11.2008 | ||
LU | 12.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | BE | 13.02.2008 | |
CY | 13.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
GB | 12.11.2008 | ||
IE | 12.11.2008 | ||
LU | 12.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/01] | BE | 13.02.2008 | |
CY | 13.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
GB | 12.11.2008 | ||
IE | 12.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/47] | BE | 13.02.2008 | |
CY | 13.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
IE | 12.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | BE | 13.02.2008 | |
CY | 13.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/24] | BE | 13.02.2008 | |
CZ | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | BE | 13.02.2008 | |
CZ | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | BE | 13.02.2008 | |
CZ | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | BE | 13.02.2008 | |
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | BE | 13.02.2008 | |
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | BE | 13.02.2008 | |
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | IS | 13.06.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2074372 (HAYLER KG); | [A]DE2528842 (DUN LEE PUBLISHING ESTABLISHME); | [A]WO8704397 (MAASS FREIMUT); | [A]US5941540 (O'HAIRE WILLIAM F [US]) |