EP1812277 - ARRANGEMENT FOR VEHICLE CABS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.02.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 22.12.2010 [2010/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VOLVO LASTVAGNAR AB 405 08 Göteborg / SE | [2007/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HASSELBERG, Lars Lagmansgatan 2 S-416 53 Göteborg / SE | [2007/43] |
Former [2007/31] | 01 /
SVENSSON, Lars Råstensgatan 40 E S-416 54 Göteborg / SE | Representative(s) | Fröhling, Werner Otto Volvo Technology Corporation Corporate Patents 06820, M1.7 405 08 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/31] | Fröhling, Werner Otto Volvo Technology Corporation, Corporate Patents, 06820, M1.7 405 08 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 04800254.7 | 02.11.2004 | [2007/31] | WO2004SE01591 | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006049536 | Date: | 11.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1812277 | Date: | 01.08.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1812277 | Date: | 16.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 11.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B62D33/067, B62D21/15 | [2007/31] | CPC: |
B62D33/067 (EP,US);
B62D21/15 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG FÜR FAHRZEUGKABINEN | [2007/31] | English: | ARRANGEMENT FOR VEHICLE CABS | [2007/31] | French: | DISPOSITIF DESTINE A DES CABINES DE VEHICULE | [2007/31] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2004 | Translation filed | 04.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/31] | 29.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.04.2008 | BE | 16.04.2008 | CY | 16.04.2008 | CZ | 16.04.2008 | DK | 16.04.2008 | EE | 16.04.2008 | FI | 16.04.2008 | IT | 16.04.2008 | NL | 16.04.2008 | PL | 16.04.2008 | RO | 16.04.2008 | SI | 16.04.2008 | SK | 16.04.2008 | TR | 16.04.2008 | BG | 16.07.2008 | SE | 16.07.2008 | GR | 17.07.2008 | ES | 27.07.2008 | IS | 16.08.2008 | PT | 17.09.2008 | HU | 17.10.2008 | LU | 02.11.2008 | IE | 03.11.2008 | CH | 30.11.2008 | LI | 30.11.2008 | MC | 30.11.2008 | [2010/51] |
Former [2010/38] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
BE | 16.04.2008 | ||
CY | 16.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IT | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
TR | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
IS | 16.08.2008 | ||
PT | 17.09.2008 | ||
HU | 17.10.2008 | ||
LU | 02.11.2008 | ||
IE | 03.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/36] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
BE | 16.04.2008 | ||
CY | 16.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IT | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
IS | 16.08.2008 | ||
PT | 17.09.2008 | ||
HU | 17.10.2008 | ||
LU | 02.11.2008 | ||
IE | 03.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
BE | 16.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IT | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
IS | 16.08.2008 | ||
PT | 17.09.2008 | ||
LU | 02.11.2008 | ||
IE | 03.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/51] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
BE | 16.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IT | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
IS | 16.08.2008 | ||
PT | 17.09.2008 | ||
IE | 03.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
BE | 16.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IT | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
IS | 16.08.2008 | ||
PT | 17.09.2008 | ||
IE | 03.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/41] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
BE | 16.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IT | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
IS | 16.08.2008 | ||
PT | 17.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
BE | 16.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
IS | 16.08.2008 | ||
PT | 17.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
BE | 16.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
IS | 16.08.2008 | ||
PT | 17.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
BE | 16.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
IS | 16.08.2008 | ||
PT | 17.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
IS | 16.08.2008 | ||
PT | 17.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
IS | 16.08.2008 | ||
PT | 17.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/05] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
IS | 16.08.2008 | ||
PT | 17.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 17.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | NL | 16.04.2008 | |
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 16.04.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE4240449 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]); | [A]FR2734781 (RENAULT VEHICULES IND [FR]); | [A]JPH11227630 (ISUZU MOTORS LTD); | [A]DE10221346 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]); | [A]WO03101809 (VOLVO LASTVAGNAR AB [SE], et al) |