EP1685300 - RETROREFLECTIVE ELEMENTS COMPRISING A BONDED RESIN CORE AND PAVEMENT MARKINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.06.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul MN 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [2006/31] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BESCUP, Terrance, L. Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
LIEDER, Stephen, L. Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
ENGEBRETSON, Joseph, D. Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
NELSON, Maureen, C. Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 05 /
HEDBLOM, Thomas, P. Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 06 /
GIVOT, Maiken Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 07 /
PURGETT, Mark, D. Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [2006/31] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/31] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04800803.1 | 04.11.2004 | [2006/31] | WO2004US36970 | Priority number, date | US20030517793P | 06.11.2003 Original published format: US 517793 P | [2006/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005047604 | Date: | 26.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1685300 | Date: | 02.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | E01F9/04, G02B5/128 | [2006/31] | CPC: |
G02B5/128 (EP,US);
E01F9/524 (EP,KR,US);
E01F9/576 (KR);
Y10T428/24372 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RETROREFLEKTIERENDE ELEMENTE MIT EINEM GEBUNDENEN HARZKERN UND STRASSENDECKENMARKIERUNGEN | [2006/31] | English: | RETROREFLECTIVE ELEMENTS COMPRISING A BONDED RESIN CORE AND PAVEMENT MARKINGS | [2006/31] | French: | ELEMENTS RETROREFLECHISSANTS COMPRENANT UN NOYAU DE RESINE LIE, ET MARQUAGES SUR CHAUSSEE | [2006/31] | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.05.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/31] | 14.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/29] | 27.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US5822120 (PALAZZOTTO MICHAEL C [US], et al) [X] 15 * column 4, line 40 - line 63 * * column 5, line 9 - line 44 * * claim 4 * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 1-14,16-28; | [Y]US3418896 (RIDEOUT DONALD C) [Y] 1-14,16-28 * column 2, line 18 - line 26 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US2003193718 (BUDD KENTON D [US], et al) [A] 1-28 * abstract *; | [A]US2003090800 (HUMPAL KATHLEEN M [US], et al) [A] 1-28 * abstract *; | [A]US4758469 (LANGE ROGER W [US]) [A] * abstract *; | [DA]US4564556 (LANGE ROGER W [US]) [DA] 1-28 * abstract * | by applicant | US5772265 | US5942280 | US4564556 | US6461988 | US3254563 | US3418896 | US3272827 | US3175935 | US3222204 | US6632508 | US2003091794 | US3849351 | US3891451 | US3935158 | US2043414 | US2440584 | US4203878 | US6166106 | WO0130873 | UST987003I | US6245700 | US2004259713 | US20040761874 | US20040762032 |