EP1687979 - STATE-BASED MEMORY UNLOADING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cisco Technology, Inc. 170 West Tasman Drive San Jose, CA 95134 / US | [2015/49] |
Former [2006/32] | For all designated states SCIENTIFIC-ATLANTA, INC. 5030 Sugarloaf Parkway Lawrenceville, GA 30044 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STALKER, Altan, J. 559 Misty Lake Lane Lawrenceville, GA 30043 / US | [2006/32] | Representative(s) | Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/13] | Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | ||
Former [2010/33] | Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | ||
Former [2006/32] | Pautex Schneider, Nicole Véronique, et al Novagraaf International SA 25, Avenue du Pailly 1220 Les Avanchets - Geneva / CH | Application number, filing date | 04801087.0 | 12.11.2004 | [2006/32] | WO2004US38400 | Priority number, date | US20030712655 | 13.11.2003 Original published format: US 712655 | [2006/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005050995 | Date: | 02.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1687979 | Date: | 09.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1687979 | Date: | 30.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/445, G06F9/48, G06F9/50 | [2015/44] | CPC: |
H04N21/8173 (EP,US);
G06F9/44594 (EP,US);
G06F9/485 (EP,US);
G06F9/5016 (EP,US);
G06F9/5022 (EP,US);
H04N21/4435 (EP,US);
H04N7/17318 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/32] | H04N7/16 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2016/13] |
Former [2007/08] | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL | ||
Former [2006/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SPEICHER-ENTLADUNG AUF ZUSTANDSBASIS | [2006/32] | English: | STATE-BASED MEMORY UNLOADING | [2006/32] | French: | DECHARGEMENT DE MEMOIRES EN FONCTION D'ETATS | [2006/32] | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/32] | 12.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.01.2007 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2012 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   27.03.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 30.03.2016 | NL | 30.03.2016 | GB | 12.11.2016 | [2018/01] |
Former [2017/04] | IT | 30.03.2016 | |
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/44] | NL | 30.03.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US6430570 (JUDGE FRANK P [US], et al) [X] 1-8,11,18-25,28 * column 4, lines 24,25 * * column 4, lines 55-59 * * column 7, lines 12-18 * * column 13, line 36 - column 14, line 14 * [Y] 9,10,12,26,27; | [X]WO0104743 (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1-8,11,18-25,28 * page 4, lines 11-23 * * page 5, lines 12-14 * * page 17, lines 1-5 *; | [A]WO02079973 (IBM [US], et al) [A] 1-12,18-28 * page 2, line 37 - page 3, line 36 *; | [X]WO9957875 (NE PRODUCTS OY [FI], et al) [X] 13-17 * page 6, lines 9-36 *; | [Y] - ANDERSON G, ANDERSON P, Enterprise JavaBeans Component Architecture: Designing and Coding Enterprise Applications (Sample Chapters), PRENTICE HALL, (2002), XP002376621 [Y] 9,10,12,26,27 * Chapter "Enterprise JavaBeans Overview", pages 3-4, "Session Beans" section Chapter "The Benefits of Stateful Session Beans", page 1, lines 30-53 * | [A] - SMITH S L, MOSIER J N, "Guidelines for Designing User Interface Software", REPORT ESD-TR-86-278, THE MITRE CORPORATION, BEDFORD, MASSACHUSETTS, USA, (198608), XP002395090 [A] 13-17 * page 242, guideline 3.5/7 * | by applicant | US6430570 | WO0104743 |