EP1700510 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR QUALITY OF SERVICE BASED HANDOVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/37] | HANDOFF APPARATUS, SYSTEMS, AND METHODS | ||
[2010/09] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2011 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/37] | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEPHENS, Adrian 64 Lamb's Lane Cottenham, Cambridge, CB4 8TA / GB | [2006/37] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/37] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher R G C Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04801094.6 | 19.11.2004 | [2006/37] | WO2004US38984 | Priority number, date | US20030736159 | 15.12.2003 Original published format: US 736159 | [2006/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005062658 | Date: | 07.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1700510 | Date: | 13.09.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1700510 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/26 | [2010/09] | CPC: |
H04W36/26 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/37] | H04Q7/38, H04L12/28 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR WEITERREICHUNG AUF DER BASIS VON DIENSTQUALITÄT | [2010/10] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR QUALITY OF SERVICE BASED HANDOVER | [2010/10] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDÉ POUR LE TRANSFERT BASÉ SUR LA QUALITÉ DE SERVICE | [2010/10] |
Former [2006/37] | WEITERREICHUNGSVORRICHTUNG, -SYSTEME UND -VERFAHREN | ||
Former [2006/37] | HANDOFF APPARATUS, SYSTEMS, AND METHODS | ||
Former [2006/37] | DISPOSITIF, SYSTEMES ET PROCEDES DE TRANSFERT | Entry into regional phase | 12.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/37] | 03.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 29.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10185485.9 / EP2276289 | Opposition(s) | 23.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/48] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 29.09.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 29.09.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.12.2010 | BE | 22.12.2010 | CY | 22.12.2010 | CZ | 22.12.2010 | DK | 22.12.2010 | EE | 22.12.2010 | FI | 22.12.2010 | HU | 22.12.2010 | NL | 22.12.2010 | PL | 22.12.2010 | RO | 22.12.2010 | SE | 22.12.2010 | SI | 22.12.2010 | SK | 22.12.2010 | TR | 22.12.2010 | BG | 22.03.2011 | GR | 23.03.2011 | IS | 22.04.2011 | PT | 22.04.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
TR | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/32] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | CY | 22.12.2010 | |
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0589552 (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 17-21 * column 1, line 47 - column 2, line 37 * * column 4, line 20 - column 8, line 37; figure 6 *; | [A]US2002045447 (RASANEN JUHA [FI]) [A] * paragraphs [0016] - [0077] *; | [A]US6377804 (LINTULAMPI RAINO [FI]) [A] * column 1, lines 1-11 * * column 3, line 51 - column 6, line 15 *; | [A]US2003093526 (NANDAGOPALAN SAISHANKAR [US], et al) [A] 4,5,9,16,18,25,26,31 * paragraphs [0009] , [0056] * * paragraphs [0097] , [0114] , [0115] *; | [X]EP1349409 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-16,28-30 * paragraphs [0005] - [0021] * * paragraphs [0032] - [0036] *; | [X] - MARTIN LEFKOWITZ-TRAPEZE NETWORKS ET AL, "Proposed draft text for the site reporting mechanism for TGk", IEEEE SUBMISSION, (20030313), XP002299876 [X] 1-16,22-33 * pages 1-4 * | [A] - MARTIN LEFKOWITZ AND MALIK AUDEH-TRAPEZE NETWORKS, "Site Reporting", IEEE SUBMISSION, (20030307), pages 1 - 9, XP002299877 [A] * pages 1-9 * |