EP1712328 - PALLET REPLACING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.07.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.08.2009 [2009/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAKINO MILLING MACHINE CO., LTD. 3-19 Nakane 2-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo 152-8578 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/42] | For all designated states MAKINO MILLING MACHINE CO. LTD. 3-19 Nakane 2-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo 152-8578 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIKUCHI, Noriyuki, MAKINO MILLING MACHINE CO, LTD 4023 Nakatsu, Aikawa-machi Aiko-gun, Kanagawa 243-0303 / JP | [2006/42] | Representative(s) | Becker, Eberhard Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/42] | Becker, Eberhard Patentanwälte Becker, Kurig, Straus Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04801644.8 | 03.12.2004 | [2006/42] | WO2004JP18420 | Priority number, date | JP20030406153 | 04.12.2003 Original published format: JP 2003406153 | [2006/42] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005053900 | Date: | 16.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1712328 | Date: | 18.10.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1712328 | Date: | 10.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.06.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q7/14 | [2007/19] | CPC: |
B23Q7/1431 (EP,US);
B23Q7/02 (EP,US);
Y10T29/5124 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/42] | B23Q7/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2007/11] |
Former [2006/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PALETTENAUSTAUSCHVORRICHTUNG | [2006/42] | English: | PALLET REPLACING DEVICE | [2006/42] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE REMPLACEMENT DE PALETTE | [2006/42] | Entry into regional phase | 02.08.2005 | Translation filed | 02.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 02.08.2005 | Search fee paid | 02.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.08.2005 | Examination requested [2006/42] | 13.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]JPH0457635 (KITAMURA MACHINERY CO LTD); | [Y]JP2000167741 (MORI SEIKI SEISAKUSHO KK); | [Y]JP2002137138 (MORI SEIKI SEISAKUSHO KK) |