Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007122645 | Global Dossier | 31.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004JP18538 | 07.12.2004 | JP2003408918 | 08.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1693192 | Global Dossier | 16.06.2010 | A4 | EP1693192 | 23.08.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004JP18538 | 07.12.2004 | JP2003408918 | 08.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1890089B | 13.04.2011 | B | CN1890089 | 03.01.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2004JP18538 | 07.12.2004 | JP2003408918 | 08.12.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005053949 | Global Dossier | 16.06.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003408918 | 08.12.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100775109B | Global Dossier | 09.11.2007 | B1 | KR20060097757 | 15.09.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2003408918 | 08.12.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4414745B | Global Dossier | 10.02.2010 | B2 | JP2005169657 | 30.06.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2003408918 | 08.12.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY137081 | 31.12.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2003408918 | 08.12.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI294825B | 21.03.2008 | B | TW200531826 | 01.10.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2003408918 | 08.12.2003 |