EP1693192 - COATED METAL PLATE WITH EXCELLENT CORROSION RESISTANCE AND REDUCED ENVIRONMENTAL IMPACT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.08.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.09.2011 [2011/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Steel Corporation 6-3 Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-71 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/34] | For all designated states NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION 6-3 Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-71 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOMURA, Hiromasa, NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION Tech. Dev. Bureau, 20-1 Shintomi Futtsu-shi, Chiba 2938511 / JP | 02 /
KANAI, Hiroshi, NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION Tech. Dev. Bureau, 20-1 Shintomi Futtsu-shi, Chiba 2938511 / JP | 03 /
TANAKA, Koki, NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION Tech. Dev. Bureau, 20-1 Shintomi Futtsu-shi, Chiba 2938511 / JP | 04 /
SHOJI, Hiromasa, NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION Tech. Dev. Bureau, 20-1 Shintomi Futtsu-shi, Chiba 2938511 / JP | [2006/34] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/34] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04801684.4 | 07.12.2004 | [2006/34] | WO2004JP18538 | Priority number, date | JP20030408918 | 08.12.2003 Original published format: JP 2003408918 | [2006/34] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005053949 | Date: | 16.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1693192 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.06.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B32B15/08, C25D9/08, B05D7/14, C23C22/78 | [2010/24] | CPC: |
C23C14/083 (EP,US);
B32B15/04 (KR);
B32B15/08 (KR);
C09D5/084 (EP,US);
C23C14/10 (EP,US);
C23C14/588 (EP,US);
C23C18/1216 (EP,US);
C23C18/1295 (EP,US);
C23C22/34 (EP,US);
C23C22/78 (EP,US);
C23C22/82 (EP,US);
C23C28/00 (EP,US);
C23C28/042 (EP,US);
C25D5/48 (EP,US);
C25D9/10 (EP,US);
B05D7/14 (EP,US);
B05D7/51 (EP,US);
B05D7/54 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12493 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12535 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12556 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12611 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/34] | B32B15/08 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB [2006/38] |
Former [2006/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BESCHICHTETE METALLPLATTE MIT HERVORRAGENDEM KORROSIONSWIDERSTAND UND VERRINGERTER UMWELTBELASTUNG | [2006/34] | English: | COATED METAL PLATE WITH EXCELLENT CORROSION RESISTANCE AND REDUCED ENVIRONMENTAL IMPACT | [2006/34] | French: | PLAQUE METALLIQUE REVETUE POSSEDANT UNE EXCELLENTE RESISTANCE A LA CORROSION ET AYANT UN EFFET REDUIT SUR L'ENVIRONNEMENT | [2006/34] | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.2006 | Translation filed | 06.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.2006 | Search fee paid | 06.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 06.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/34] | 11.07.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.08.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 28.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/39] | 13.05.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/39] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.09.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]JPH08276533 (NIPPON PAINT CO LTD) [I] 2,5,6 * abstract *; | [I]US6183570 (KAWAGUCHI JUN [JP], et al) [I] 2,5,6 * column 5, line 10 - column 10, line 12; claim - *; | [X]WO03048416 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1-6 * example 3; claim -; tables 5-7 *; | [XP]EP1455001 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]) [XP] 1-6* example 3; claim -; tables 5-7 *; | [E]EP1688515 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]) [E] 1-6 * example -; claim - *; | [E]EP1690676 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]) [E] 1-6 * example -; claim - * | International search | [X]JP2001348678 (NISSHIN STEEL CO LTD); | [X]JPH0825552 (NHK SPRING CO LTD); | [X]JPH0432577 (KOBE STEEL LTD) |