02.03.2012 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 04.04.2012 [2012/14] |
28.02.2012 |
New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure |
|
31.01.2012 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
08.09.2011 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
01.02.2011 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
22.11.2010 |
Change: Appeal number |
|
26.10.2010 |
New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of appeal |
|
08.10.2010 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 10.11.2010 [2010/45] |
12.08.2010 |
New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal |
|
12.08.2010 |
New entry: Appeal number |
|
08.06.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
08.06.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused |
|
12.02.2010 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
08.01.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.12.2008 |
Change: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.12.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.02.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
22.12.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.10.2007 |
First examination report |
|
24.10.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
09.02.2007 |
Change - extension states |
published on 14.03.2007 [2007/11] |
05.01.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.08.2006 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 06.09.2006 [2006/36] |
04.08.2006 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 06.09.2006 [2006/36] |
26.07.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.07.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.07.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.06.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.06.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.01.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|