EP1697152 - MODULAR HEATING SYSTEM FOR LARGE VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.03.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.04.2012 [2012/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UWE-VERKEN AB P.O. Box 262, Oskarsgatan 23 S-601 04 Norrköping / SE | [2006/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HESOUN, Peter Söderleden 28 S-587 31 Linköping / SE | 02 /
KARLSSON, Tomas Lindbyvägen 9 S-616 30 by / SE | [2006/36] | Representative(s) | Valea AB Box 1098 405 23 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/36] | Valea AB Lindholmspiren 5 417 56 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 04801703.2 | 02.12.2004 | [2006/36] | WO2004SE01784 | Priority number, date | US20030526290P | 03.12.2003 Original published format: US 526290 P | SE20030003258 | 03.12.2003 Original published format: SE 0303258 | [2006/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005053977 | Date: | 16.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1697152 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 16.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/00 | [2006/36] | CPC: |
B60H1/00328 (EP,US);
B60H1/00371 (EP,SE,US);
F28D1/024 (EP,US);
F28D1/04 (EP,US);
F28F1/30 (EP,US);
F28F1/32 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MODULARES HEIZSYSTEM FÜR GROSSE FAHRZEUGE | [2006/36] | English: | MODULAR HEATING SYSTEM FOR LARGE VEHICLES | [2006/36] | French: | SYSTEME DE CHAUFFAGE MODULAIRE POUR VEHICULES DE GRANDES DIMENSIONS | [2006/36] | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 08.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/36] | 26.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.06.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 10.06.2010 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 01.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/14] | 14.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/14] | Appeal following examination | 10.08.2010 | Appeal received No. T2281/10 | 20.10.2010 | Statement of grounds filed | 25.11.2011 | Result of appeal procedure: the application was deemed to be withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | EP10185863.7 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 03.11.2010 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.10.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2010 | 07   M06   Not yet paid | 31.12.2011 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE4209963 (THOMAE RUDOLF [DE]); | [X]DE19708815 (EVOBUS GMBH [DE]); | [A]DE19645545 (WEBASTO KLIMATECH GMBH [DE]); | [A]DE19714830 (WEBASTO KLIMATECH GMBH [DE]); | [X]WO0189867 (UWE VERKEN AB [SE], et al) |