EP1704502 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR OPTIMIZING DOSE DELIVERY OF RADIATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 02.10.2009 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2009 | Refusal of application | published on 04.11.2009 [2009/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE UNIVERSITY OF WESTERN ONTARIO Industry Liason Building, Stevenson-Lawson Building, Room 328 London Ontario N6A 5B8 / CA | [2006/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOLDMAN, Samuel, Pedro 1144 Quinton Road London, Ontario N6H 4R1 / CA | 02 /
BATTISTA, Jerry, J. 87 Orkney Cr. London, Ontario N5X 3R8 / CA | 03 /
CHEN, Jeff, Z. 134 Laurel St. London, Ontario N6H 4X1 / CA | [2006/39] | Representative(s) | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/39] | Harrison Goddard Foote Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds LS2 8DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 04802285.9 | 10.12.2004 | [2006/39] | WO2004CA02108 | Priority number, date | US20030528775P | 12.12.2003 Original published format: US 528775 P | US20040566433P | 30.04.2004 Original published format: US 566433 P | US20040602631P | 19.08.2004 Original published format: US 602631 P | [2006/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005057463 | Date: | 23.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1704502 | Date: | 27.09.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 23.06.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/00, A61N5/00 | [2006/39] | CPC: |
A61N5/1031 (EP,US);
G16H20/40 (EP,US);
A61N5/1042 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR OPTIMIERUNG DER DOSISABLIEFERUNG VON STRAHLUNG | [2006/39] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR OPTIMIZING DOSE DELIVERY OF RADIATION | [2006/39] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME POUR OPTIMISER L'ADMINISTRATION DOSEE DE RAYONNEMENTS | [2006/39] | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.2006 | Search fee paid | 05.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/39] | 07.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.2009 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.06.2009 | 09.06.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.06.2009 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 16.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/45] | 26.06.2009 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - STARKSCHALL G, "A constrained least-squares optimization method for external beam radiation therapy treatment planning.", MEDICAL PHYSICS 1984 SEP-OCT, (198409), vol. 11, no. 5, ISSN 0094-2405, pages 659 - 665, XP002462076 [X] 1-19,23-28 * abstract * * page 660, column L, paragraph 2 - page 662, column L, paragraph 2 * * page 664, column L, paragraph 2 - page 665, column R, paragraph L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1118/1.595548 | [X] - CENSOR Y, "Mathematical aspects of radiation therapy treatment planning: continuous inversion versus full discretization and optimization versus feasibility", COMPUTATIONAL RADIOLOGY AND IMAGING: THERAPY AND DIAGNOSTICS, (1999), vol. 110, pages 1 - 12, XP002268598 [X] 1-19,23-28 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 3 - page 3, paragraph 1 * * page 4, paragraph L - page 9, paragraph L * * figure 2 * | [X] - HILBIG MATTHIAS ET AL, "Design of an inverse planning system for radiotherapy using linear optimization Entwicklung eines inversen Bestrahlungsplanungssystems mit linearer Optimierung", ZEITSCHRIFT FUER MEDIZINISCHE PHYSIK, URBAN UND FISCHER, JENA, DE, (2002), vol. 12, no. 2, ISSN 0939-3889, pages 89 - 96, XP009093567 [X] 1-19,23-28 * abstract * * page 90, column R, paragraph 2 - page 91, column R, paragraph L * * page 92, column L, paragraph 4 - page 93, column L, paragraph L * * figures 1,2 * | International search | [A]US6038283 (CAROL MARK P [US], et al); | [A]US2002008015 (KOSAKAI MAMORU [JP], et al); | [A]US6546073 (LEE EVA K [US]); | [A]US2003212325 (COTRUTZ CRISTIAN [US], et al); | [A]WO03099380 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) | by applicant | - "Entwicklung eines inversen Bestrahlungsplanungssystems mit linearer Optimierung", MED. PHYS., (2002), vol. 12, pages 89 - 96 | - MED. PHYS., (198409), vol. 11, no. 5, page 659 |