EP1701638 - LEVER ARM WITH TACTILE CONTOUR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ergo-Industrial Seating Systems Inc. 5616 McAdam Drive Mississauga Ontario L4Z 1P1 / CA | [2015/45] |
Former [2006/38] | For all designated states Ergo-Industrial Seating Systems Inc. 5616 McAdam Drive Mississauga Ontario L4Z 1P1 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CASSADAY, Terry 306 Vesta Drive Toronto, Ontario M5P 3A1 / CA | [2006/38] | Representative(s) | Carpmael, Robert Maurice Charles, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/50] | Carpmael, Robert Maurice Charles, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2006/38] | Hitchcock, Esmond Antony, et al Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 04802307.1 | 15.12.2004 | [2006/38] | WO2004CA02132 | Priority number, date | CA20032453221 | 16.12.2003 Original published format: CA 2453221 | [2006/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005058095 | Date: | 30.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1701638 | Date: | 20.09.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1701638 | Date: | 04.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 30.06.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A47C1/022 | [2015/22] | CPC: |
A47C1/022 (EP,US);
A47C1/024 (EP,US);
A47C7/62 (US);
A47C7/622 (EP,US);
F02C9/56 (EP,US);
F05D2270/021 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/10] | A47C1/024, A47C7/00, A47C31/00, G05G1/28, G05G25/00 | ||
Former IPC [2006/38] | A47C7/00, A47C31/00, G05G1/28, G05G25/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/45] |
Former [2006/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | HEBELARM MIT HAPTISCHER KONTUR | [2006/38] | English: | LEVER ARM WITH TACTILE CONTOUR | [2006/38] | French: | BRAS DE LEVIER À CONTOUR TACTILE | [2015/23] |
Former [2006/38] | BRAS DE LEVIER A CONTOUR TACTILE | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 19.06.2006 | Search fee paid | 19.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/38] | 12.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.09.2012 | Opposition(s) | 05.08.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2011 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   25.01.2012 | 31.12.2013 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   23.06.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.12.2004 | AT | 04.11.2015 | BE | 04.11.2015 | BG | 04.11.2015 | CY | 04.11.2015 | CZ | 04.11.2015 | DK | 04.11.2015 | EE | 04.11.2015 | ES | 04.11.2015 | FI | 04.11.2015 | IT | 04.11.2015 | LT | 04.11.2015 | NL | 04.11.2015 | PL | 04.11.2015 | RO | 04.11.2015 | SE | 04.11.2015 | SI | 04.11.2015 | SK | 04.11.2015 | TR | 04.11.2015 | GR | 05.02.2016 | IS | 04.03.2016 | PT | 04.03.2016 | [2017/46] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 15.12.2004 | |
AT | 04.11.2015 | ||
BE | 04.11.2015 | ||
BG | 04.11.2015 | ||
CY | 04.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
TR | 04.11.2015 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
BE | 04.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 04.11.2015 | |
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 04.11.2015 | |
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 04.11.2015 | |
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 04.11.2015 | |
LT | 04.11.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]US5630647 (HEIDMANN KURT R [US], et al); | [X]US6609760 (MATERN GERARD J [CA], et al); | [Y]US5700051 (NEWHOUSE THOMAS J [US]); | [Y]USD458777S (BENDEN MARK E [US], et al); | [Y]CA2327000 (CASSADAY TERRY [CA]); | [A]US5102169 (MAYFIELD MARY E [US]); | [AL] - "DriveR Chair by Steelcase. Adjustability: Interactive user guide", STEELCASE INC, Macromedia Flash content, URL: http://www.steelcase.com/na/products.aspx?f=d196247bb446b64fdbb0a3d39f4fc8cb, (20050308), XP008097708 |