Designated contracting states | AT | | BE | | BG | Lapse: 28.04.2015 | CH | | CY | Lapse: 28.01.2015 | CZ | Lapse: 28.01.2015 | DE | | DK | | EE | Lapse: 28.01.2015 | ES | | FI | Lapse: 28.01.2015 | FR | | GB | | GR | Lapse: 29.04.2015 | HU | | IE | | IS | Lapse: 28.05.2015 | IT | | LI | | LT | Lapse: 28.01.2015 | LU | | MC | Lapse: 28.01.2015 | NL | | PL | | PT | Lapse: 28.01.2015 | RO | Lapse: 28.01.2015 | SE | | SI | Lapse: 28.01.2015 | SK | Lapse: 28.01.2015 | TR | | Examination procedure | 04.11.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | | 09.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | | 09.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 04.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 15.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2007 | 04   M06  
Fee paid on  
17.01.2008 | European patent granted | 28.01.2015 | Opposition procedure | 29.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.12.2015 | INPADOC data Tooltip | The EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority. | Event date: | 03.10.2007 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20070609 | | Event date: | 03.10.2007 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | | Event date: | 02.04.2008 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (DELETED) | | Event date: | 30.04.2008 | | Event description: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 20080328 | | Event date: | 03.09.2014 | | Event description: | INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED | Effective DATE: | 20140804 | | Event date: | 28.01.2015 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | | Event date: | 28.01.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED | Free Format Text: | NOT ENGLISH | | Event date: | 30.01.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH EP | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI | | Event date: | 05.03.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R096 502004014823 DE | Code Expl.: | +DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT | Effective DATE: | 20150305 | | Event date: | 15.03.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT REF 707933 AT T | Code Expl.: | +REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT VALIDATED IN AUSTRIA) | Effective DATE: | 20150315 | | Event date: | 08.04.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES FG2A 2533256 ES T3 | Code Expl.: | +DEFINITIVE PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20150408 | | Event date: | 15.04.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH NV | Code Expl.: | NEW AGENT | REPRESENTATIVE: | DR. LUSUARDI AG, CH | | Event date: | 15.04.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL T3 | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION FILED FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995 | | Event date: | 22.04.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL T3 | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION FILED FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995 | | Event date: | 25.02.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND | Free Format Text: | LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN | | Event date: | 27.04.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DK T3 | Code Expl.: | +EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS | Effective DATE: | 20150421 | | Event date: | 06.05.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL T3 | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION FILED FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995 | | Event date: | 12.05.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SE TRGR | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT | | Event date: | 25.06.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG LT MG4D | Code Expl.: | -INVALIDATED EUROPEAN PATENT | | Event date: | 31.07.2015 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20150128 | | Event date: | 31.07.2015 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BG | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20150428 | | Event date: | 31.07.2015 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20150128 | | Event date: | 31.08.2015 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IS | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20150528 | | Event date: | 31.08.2015 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20150429 | | Event date: | 31.08.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG PL T3 | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT | | Event date: | 30.10.2015 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SK | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20150128 | | Event date: | 30.10.2015 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | EE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20150128 | | Event date: | 30.10.2015 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | RO | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20150128 | | Event date: | 30.10.2015 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CZ | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20150128 | | Event date: | 30.11.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HU AG4A E024663 HU | Code Expl.: | +FILING OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE TEXT OF EUROPEAN PATENTS | | Event date: | 06.01.2016 | | Event description: | NO OPPOSITION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20151029 | | Event date: | 29.10.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R097 502004014823 DE | Code Expl.: | +NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION | | Event date: | 30.12.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 12 | | Event date: | 29.02.2016 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20150128 | | Event date: | 29.07.2016 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | MC | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20150128 | | Event date: | 22.12.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 13 | | Event date: | 30.06.2017 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CY | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20150128 | | Event date: | 21.12.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 29.06.2018 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20150128 | | Event date: | 06.05.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R082 502004014823 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE | REPRESENTATIVE: | SPARING - ROEHL - HENSELER, DE | | Event date: | 14.05.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PCOW | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF PATENT OWNER(S) | Free Format Text: | NEW ADDRESS: KLOSTERBERG 11, 4051 BASEL (CH) | | Event date: | 28.05.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HU HC9C | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF NAME, ADDRESS | OWNER: | MESTEX AG, CH | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER(S): MESTEX AG, CH | | Event date: | 06.05.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R081 502004014823 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE | OWNER: | MESTEX AG, CH | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER: MESTEX AG, ZUERICH, CH | | Event date: | 06.05.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R082 502004014823 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE | REPRESENTATIVE: | KUTZENBERGER WOLFF & PARTNER PATENTANWALTSPART, DE | | Event date: | 07.06.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R082 502004014823 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE | REPRESENTATIVE: | KUTZENBERGER WOLFF & PARTNER PATENTANWALTSPART, DE | | Event date: | 09.01.2015 | | Event description: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Event date: | 11.11.2014 | | Event description: | GRANT FEE PAID | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3 | | Event date: | 05.08.2014 | | Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1 | | Event date: | 31.08.2007 | | Event description: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Event date: | 04.12.2015 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | | Event date: | 01.07.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG LU HC | Code Expl.: | CHANGE/CORRECTION OF NAME AND/OR ADDRESS OF THE OWNERS | OWNER: | MESTEX AG; DE | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER: MESTEX AG | Effective DATE: | 20210617 | | Event date: | 01.07.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG LU HC | Code Expl.: | CHANGE/CORRECTION OF NAME AND/OR ADDRESS OF THE OWNERS | OWNER: | MESTEX AG; CH | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER: MESTEX AG | Effective DATE: | 20210617 | | Event date: | 04.12.2015 | | Event description: | NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261 | | Event date: | 01.04.2022 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG LU HC | Code Expl.: | CHANGE/CORRECTION OF NAME AND/OR ADDRESS OF THE OWNERS | OWNER: | MESTEX AG; CH | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER: MESTEX AG | Effective DATE: | 20220324 | | Event date: | 28.04.2022 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HU HC9C | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF NAME, ADDRESS | OWNER: | MESTEX AG, CH | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER(S): MESTEX AG, CH; MESTEX AG, CH | | Event date: | 06.05.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R081 502004014823 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE | OWNER: | GRUENENTHAL GMBH, DE | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER: MESTEX AG, ZUERICH, CH | | Event date: | 29.06.2022 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL PD | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF OWNERSHIP | OWNER: | GRUENENTHAL GMBH; DE | Free Format Text: | DETAILS ASSIGNMENT: CHANGE OF OWNER(S), ASSIGNMENT; FORMER OWNER NAME: MESTEX AG | Effective DATE: | 20220615 | | Event date: | 06.07.2022 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB 732E | Code Expl.: | AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977) | Free Format Text: | REGISTERED BETWEEN 20220609 AND 20220615 | | Event date: | 30.05.2022 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R081 502004014823 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE | OWNER: | GRUENENTHAL GMBH, DE | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER: MESTEX AG, BASEL, CH | | Event date: | 07.07.2022 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES PC2A | Code Expl.: | +TRANSFER OF PATENT | OWNER: | GRUENENTHAL GMBH | Effective DATE: | 20220701 | | Event date: | 01.07.2022 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG LU PD | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF OWNERSHIP | OWNER: | GRUENENTHAL PHARMA AG; CH | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER: MESTEX AG | Effective DATE: | 20220602 | | Event date: | 01.07.2022 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG LU PD | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF OWNERSHIP | OWNER: | GRUENENTHAL GMBH; DE | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER: GRUENENTHAL PHARMA AG | Effective DATE: | 20220602 | | Event date: | 28.07.2022 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HU FH1C | Code Expl.: | APPOINTMENT OF REPRESENTATIVE | Free Format Text: | FORMER REPRESENTATIVE(S): DR. MISKOLCZI MARIA UEGYVED, HU | REPRESENTATIVE: | DR. MISKOLCZI MARIA UEGYVED, HU | | Event date: | 28.07.2022 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HU GB9C | Code Expl.: | SUCCESSION IN TITLE | OWNER: | GRUENENTHAL GMBH, DE | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER(S): MESTEX AG, CH; GRUENENTHAL PHARMA AG, CH; MESTEX AG, CH; MESTEX AG, CH | | Event date: | 01.08.2022 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG BE PD | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF OWNERSHIP | OWNER: | GRUENENTHAL GMBH; DE | Free Format Text: | DETAILS ASSIGNMENT: CHANGE OF OWNER(S), ASSIGNMENT; FORMER OWNER NAME: GRUENENTHAL PHARMA AG | Effective DATE: | 20220603 | | Event date: | 15.10.2022 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT PC 707933 AT T | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF THE OWNER | OWNER: | GRUENENTHAL GMBH, DE | Effective DATE: | 20220830 | | Event date: | 12.07.2023 | | Event description: | OPT-OUT OF THE COMPETENCE OF THE UNIFIED PATENT COURT (UPC) REGISTERED | Effective DATE: | 20230530 | | Event date: | 29.12.2023 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Payment DATE: | 20231116 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 18.01.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 20231109 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 31.01.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Payment DATE: | 20231127 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 31.01.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20231031 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 31.01.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DK | Payment DATE: | 20231215 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 31.01.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 20231108 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 31.01.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | HU | Payment DATE: | 20231121 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 31.01.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IE | Payment DATE: | 20231109 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 31.01.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Payment DATE: | 20231110 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 31.01.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LU | Payment DATE: | 20231214 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 31.01.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Payment DATE: | 20231110 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 29.02.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Payment DATE: | 20231121 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 29.02.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PL | Payment DATE: | 20231012 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 16.04.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Payment DATE: | 20240116 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 30.04.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CH | Payment DATE: | 20240101 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 31.05.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | TR | Payment DATE: | 20231226 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 28.12.2024 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R071 502004014823 DE | Code Expl.: | -EXPIRY OF RIGHT | | Event date: | 30.12.2024 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PL | Code Expl.: | -PATENT CEASED | | Event date: | 02.01.2025 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DK EUP | Code Expl.: | -EP PATENT EXPIRED | Expiry DATE: | 20241228 | | Event date: | 08.01.2025 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES FD2A | Code Expl.: | -ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN | Effective DATE: | 20250108 | | Event date: | 08.01.2025 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL MK | Code Expl.: | -PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT | Effective DATE: | 20241227 | | Event date: | 15.01.2025 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB PE20 | Code Expl.: | -PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS | Expiry DATE: | 20241227 | | Event date: | 17.01.2025 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20241227 | | Event date: | 24.01.2025 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20241228 | | Event date: | 28.01.2025 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SE EUG | Code Expl.: | -EP PATENT HAS LAPSED | | Event date: | 28.01.2025 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20241229 | | Event date: | 31.01.2025 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20241229 | | Event date: | 31.01.2025 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20241227 | | Event date: | 31.01.2025 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20241228 | | Event date: | 07.02.2025 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG BE MK | Code Expl.: | -PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT | Effective DATE: | 20241228 | | Event date: | 15.02.2025 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT MK07 707933 AT T | Code Expl.: | -EXPIRY | Effective DATE: | 20241228 | | Event date: | 29.01.2025 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE MK9A | Code Expl.: | -PATENT EXPIRED | |