EP1693378 - PROTEIN NMB1125 AND USE THEREOF IN PHARMACEUTICAL FORMULATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.2010 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 10.08.2011 [2011/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CENTRO DE INGENIERIA GENETICA Y BIOTECNOLOGIA (CIGB) Avenida 31 entre 158 y 190, Cubanacan Playa Ciudad de la Habana 10600 / CU | [2006/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAJON FEYT, Rolando Calle 150 24312 entre 245 y 243 Bauta., La Habana 32400 / CU | 02 /
GUILLEN NIETO, Gerardo Enrique Av. 31 18207 Apto. 34 entre 182 y 184, Playa Cuba., Ciudad de la Habana 12100 / CU | 03 /
SARDINAS GARCIA, Gretel, Calle Jorge 18 entre Espadero y, Freyre D'Andrade Rpto. Sevillano, 10 de Octubre Cuba, Ciudad de la Habana 10500 / CU | 04 /
BETANCOURT NUNEZ, Lázaro Hiram SP 22 Apto 52 Micro X, Alamar, Habana del Este Ciudad de la Habana 12500 / CU | 05 /
CASTELLANOS SERRA, Lila, Rosa Kholy 51 entre 28 y 30 Plaza. Ciudad de la Habana 11300 / CU | 06 /
PERERA NEGRIN, Yasser Calle 19 2407 entre 24 y Linea, Bejucal. La Habana 32600 / CU | 07 /
GARCIA DIAZ, Darién Avenida 17 7614 entre 76 y 78 Apto. B Playa, Ciudad de La Habana 11300 / CU | 08 /
NIEBLA PEREZ, Olivia Calle 186 3117 entre 31 y 33 Apto 9D Playa, Ciudad de la Habana 11600 / CU | 09 /
CABALLERO MENENDEZ, Evelin Av/ 31A Ed. C17 entre 186 y 188 Apto. 5 Cubanacan, Playa., Ciudad Habana 11600 / CU | 10 /
GONZALEZ BLANCO, Sonia C/ 184 3112 Apto 42 entre 31 y 33-A Cubanacán, Playa., Ciudad Habana 12100 / CU | [2009/20] |
Former [2006/34] | 01 /
PAJON FEYT, Rolando Calle 150 24312 entre 245 y 243 Bauta., La Habana 32400 / CU | ||
02 /
GUILLEN NIETO, Gerardo Enrique Av. 31 18207 Apto. 34 entre 182 y 184, Playa Cuba., Ciudad de la Habana 12100 / CU | |||
03 /
SARDINAS GARCIA, Gretel, C/Jorge 18 Freyre D'Andrade Rpto. Sevillano, 10 de Octubre Cuba, Ciudad de la Habana 10500 / CU | |||
04 /
BETANCOURT NUNEZ, Lázaro Hiram SP 22 Apto 52 Micro X, Alamar, Habana del Este Ciudad de la Habana 12500 / CU | |||
05 /
CASTELLANOS SERRA, Lila, Rosa Kholy 51 entre 28 y 30 Plaza. Ciudad de la Habana 11300 / CU | |||
06 /
PERERA NEGRIN, Yasser Calle 19 2407 entre 24 y Linea, Bejucal. La Habana 32600 / CU | |||
07 /
GARCIA DIAZ, Darién Avenida 17 7614 entre 76 y 78 Apto. B Playa, Ciudad de La Habana 11300 / CU | |||
08 /
NIEBLA PEREZ, Olivia Calle 186 3117 entre 31 y 33 Apto 9D Playa, Ciudad de la Habana 11600 / CU | |||
09 /
CABALLERO MENENDEZ, Evelin Av/ 31A Ed. C17 entre 186 y 188 Apto. 5 Cubanacan, Playa., Ciudad Habana 12100 / CU | |||
10 /
GONZALEZ BLANCO, Sonia C/ 184 3112 Apto 42 entre 31 y 33-A Cubanacán, Playa., Ciudad Habana 12100 / CU | Representative(s) | van Loon, C.J.J. Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | van Loon, C.J.J. Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2006/34] | van Loon, C.J.J. c/o VEREENIGDE Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 04802607.4 | 02.12.2004 | [2006/34] | WO2004CU00015 | Priority number, date | CU28503 | 03.12.2003 Original published format: CU 28503 | [2006/34] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005054281 | Date: | 16.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1693378 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1693378 | Date: | 30.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/40] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1693378 | Date: | 19.05.2010 | [2010/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/22, C12N15/31, A61K39/095, C12N1/21, G01N33/569, C12Q1/68, A61K48/00 | [2006/34] | CPC: |
C07K14/22 (EP,KR,US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61K2039/523 (EP,US);
A61K2039/53 (EP,US);
A61K39/00 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/34] | Extension states | AL | 26.05.2006 | BA | 26.05.2006 | HR | 26.05.2006 | LV | 26.05.2006 | MK | 26.05.2006 | YU | 26.05.2006 | Title | German: | NMB1125-PROTEIN UND DESSEN VERWENDUNG IN PHARMAZEUTISCHEN FORMULIERUNGEN | [2006/34] | English: | PROTEIN NMB1125 AND USE THEREOF IN PHARMACEUTICAL FORMULATIONS | [2006/34] | French: | PROTEINE NMB1125 ET SON UTILISATION DANS LES FORMULATIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES | [2006/34] | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.2006 | Translation filed | 26.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.07.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.05.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/34] | 25.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.09.2009 | BE | 30.09.2009 | CY | 30.09.2009 | CZ | 30.09.2009 | DK | 30.09.2009 | EE | 30.09.2009 | FI | 30.09.2009 | LT | 30.09.2009 | NL | 30.09.2009 | RO | 30.09.2009 | SI | 30.09.2009 | SK | 30.09.2009 | IE | 02.12.2009 | LU | 02.12.2009 | BG | 31.12.2009 | GR | 31.12.2009 | IS | 30.01.2010 | PT | 01.02.2010 | HU | 01.04.2010 | [2011/32] |
Former [2011/21] | AT | 30.09.2009 | |
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
CY | 30.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
IE | 02.12.2009 | ||
LU | 02.12.2009 | ||
BG | 31.12.2009 | ||
GR | 31.12.2009 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 30.09.2009 | |
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
CY | 30.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
IE | 02.12.2009 | ||
BG | 31.12.2009 | ||
GR | 31.12.2009 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 30.09.2009 | |
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
CY | 30.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
IE | 02.12.2009 | ||
GR | 31.12.2009 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | AT | 30.09.2009 | |
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
CY | 30.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 30.09.2009 | |
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
CY | 30.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 30.09.2009 | |
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
CY | 30.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/28] | BE | 30.09.2009 | |
CY | 30.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CY | 30.09.2009 | |
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/23] | CZ | 30.09.2009 | |
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/22] | CZ | 30.09.2009 | |
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/20] | EE | 30.09.2009 | |
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | FI | 30.09.2009 | |
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0066791 (CHIRON CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-31 * the whole document *; | [X] - "Putative periplasmic protein.", UniProt, (20001001), Database accession no. Q9JQZ2, URL: EBI, XP002331525 [X] 1-31 * the whole document * | [ ] - PARKHILL, J. ET AL., "Complete cDNA sequence of a serogroup A strain of Nesisseria meningitidis Z2491", NATURE, (2000), vol. 404, pages 502 - 506, XP000918875 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/35006655 | [A] - "Neisseria meningitidis serogroup A strain Z2491 complete genome; segment 4/7", EMBL, (20000330), Database accession no. NMA4Z2491, URL: EBI, XP002331526 [A] 1-31 * the whole document * | [ ] - PARKHILL, J. ET AL., "Complete DNA sequence of a serogroup A strain of Neisseria meningitidis Z2491", NATURE, (2000), vol. 404, pages 502 - 506 | [PX] - "Hypothetical protein NMB1125 (Hypothetical protein NMB1163).", UniProt, (20040705), Database accession no. Q7DDH5, URL: EBI, XP002331527 [PX] 1-31 * the whole document * | [ ] - HERVÉ TETTELIN ET AL., "Complete genome sequence of Neisseria meningitidis serogroup B strain MC58", SCIENCE, (20000310), vol. 287, pages 1809 - 1815 | by applicant | - PIZZA M ET AL., "Identification of Vaccine Candidates Against Serogroup B Meningococcus by Whole-Genome Sequencing", SCIENCE, (2000), vol. 287, no. 5459, pages 1816 - 20 | - GIULIANI MM ET AL., PROCEEDINGS 12TH IPNC, (2000), page 22 | - SANTINI L. ET AL., PROCEEDINGS 12TH IPNC., (2000), page 25 |