EP1696962 - NOVEL GLP-1 ANALOGUES LINKED TO ALBUMIN-LIKE AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.12.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.01.2011 [2011/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NOVO NORDISK A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2006/36] | For all designated states NOVO NORDISK A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANSEN, Thomas Kruse Tibbevangen 78 DK-2730 Herlev / DK | 02 /
ZUNDEL, Magali Plantevej 27, 3 t.h. DK-2860 Soborg / DK | 03 /
MADSEN, Kjeld Nyvestergardsvej 3 DK-3500 Vaerlose / DK | 04 /
SVENDSEN, Anne Korshoj 129 DK-3670 Vekso / DK | 05 /
SCHIODT, Christine Bruun Risbyholmvej 20, st DK-2700 Bronshoj / DK | 06 /
LAU, Jesper Rosenvaenget 3 DK-3520 Farum / DK | [2006/36] | Representative(s) | Nielsen, Lars Balzer, et al Novo Nordisk A/S Corporate Patents Novo Allée 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2007/41] | Nielsen, Lars Balzer, et al Novo Nordisk A/S Corporate Patents Novo Allée 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | ||
Former [2006/36] | Jensen, Dorte Kold, et al Novo Nordisk A/S, Corporate Patents, Novo Allé 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | Application number, filing date | 04803038.1 | 17.12.2004 | [2006/36] | WO2004DK00887 | Priority number, date | DK20030001883 | 18.12.2003 Original published format: DK 200301883 | [2006/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005058958 | Date: | 30.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1696962 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/48, C07K14/47, C07K14/605, A61K38/26, A61K38/38, C07K14/765, C07K19/00, A61P3/10 | [2006/36] | CPC: |
C07K14/605 (EP,US);
C07K14/765 (KR);
A61K38/00 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/50 (KR);
A61K47/643 (EP,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07K14/46 (EP,US);
C07K14/47 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MIT ALBUMINARTIGEN MITTELN VERKNÜPFTE NEUE GLP-1-ANALOGA | [2006/36] | English: | NOVEL GLP-1 ANALOGUES LINKED TO ALBUMIN-LIKE AGENTS | [2006/36] | French: | NOUVEAUX ANALOGUES GLP-1 LIES A DES AGENTS DE TYPE ALBUMINE | [2006/36] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/36] | 02.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.05.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 11.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2008 | Observations by third parties | 15.12.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/03] | Request for further processing for: | 11.07.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 11.07.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.08.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DY]WO0246227 (LILLY CO ELI [US], et al) [DY] 1-43,1-43,1-43 * the whole document * * the whole document * * the whole document *; | [Y]WO03059934 (HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-43,1-43,1-43 * paragraph [0988] - paragraph [1054]; claim - * * paragraph [0988] - paragraph [1054]; claim - * * paragraph [0988] - paragraph [1054]; claim - *; | [E]WO2004110472 (LILLY CO ELI [US], et al) [E] 1-43,1-43,1-43 * example 1 * * example 1 ** example 1 *; | [Y] - KIM J-G ET AL, "DEVELOPMENT AND CHARACTERIZATION OF A GLUCAGON-LIKE PEPTIDE 1-ALBUMIN CONJUGATE THE ABILITY TO ACTIVATE THE GLUCAGON-LIKE PEPTIDE 1 RECEPTOR IN VIVO", DIABETES, NEW YORK, NY, US, (200303), vol. 52, no. 3, ISSN 0012-1797, pages 751 - 759, XP008042628 [Y] 1-43,1-43,1-43 * the whole document * * the whole document * * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2337/diabetes.52.3.751 | [T] - NAUCK M A ET AL, "Glucagon-like peptide 1 and its derivatives in the treatment of diabetes", REGULATORY PEPTIDES, ELSEVIER SCIENCE BV, NL, (20050615), vol. 128, no. 2, ISSN 0167-0115, pages 135 - 148, XP004789694 [T] 1-43,1-43,1-43 * figure 5 * * figure 5 * * figure 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.regpep.2004.07.014 | other | US6329336 | - KIM J-G. ET AL, "DEVELOPMENT AND CHARACTERIZATION OF A GLUCAGON-LIKE PEPTIDE 1-ALBUMIN CONJUGATE THE ABILITY TO ACTIVATE THE GLUCAGON-LIKE PEPTIDE 1 RECEPTOR IN VIVO", DIABETES, (20030301), vol. 52, no. 3, pages 751 - 759, XP008042628 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2337/diabetes.52.3.751 |