EP1686866 - HANDLING DEVICE FOR A CONTAINER USED IN THE TOBACCO INDUSTRY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.10.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hauni Primary GmbH Grabauer Strasse 49 21493 Schwarzenbek / DE | [2006/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DIERKEN, Hans Dehnsener Strasse 7 21385 Amelinghausen / DE | 02 /
DENKER, Wolfgang Altengammer Elbdeich 248 a 21039 Hamburg / DE | 03 /
SEIDE, Ulf Lenhartzstrasse 22 20249 Hamburg / DE | 04 /
HAGEMANN, Fritz Grillparzerstrasse 4 22085 Hamburg / DE | 05 /
BENZ, Wolfgang Am Büchenbergskamp 42 21039 Börnsen / DE | [2007/46] |
Former [2006/32] | 01 /
DIERKEN, Hans Dehnsener Strasse 7 21385 Amelinghausen / DE | ||
02 /
DENKER, Wolfgang Altengammer Elbdeich 248 a 21039 Hamburg / DE | |||
03 /
SEIDE, Ulf Lenhartzstrasse 22 20249 Hamburg / DE | |||
04 /
HAGEMANN, Fritz Grillparzerstrasse 4 22085 Hamburg / DE | |||
05 /
BENZ, Wolfgang Am Hainholz 7a 22885 Stemwarde/Barsbüttel / DE | Representative(s) | Grebner, Christian Georg Rudolf Patentanwälte Seemann & Partner Raboisen 6 20095 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/32] | Grebner, Christian Georg Rudolf Patentanwälte Seemann & Partner Ballindamm 3 20095 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 04803216.3 | 22.11.2004 | [2006/32] | WO2004EP13231 | Priority number, date | DE2003155393 | 25.11.2003 Original published format: DE 10355393 | DE20041045039 | 15.09.2004 Original published format: DE102004045039 | [2006/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005051806 | Date: | 09.06.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/23] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1686866 | Date: | 09.08.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A24B7/14 | [2006/32] | CPC: |
A24B3/00 (EP);
A24B7/14 (EP);
B65G47/901 (EP);
B65G65/23 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HANDHABUNGSEINRICHTUNG FÜR BEHÄLTER DER TABAK VERARBEITENDEN INDUSTRIE | [2006/32] | English: | HANDLING DEVICE FOR A CONTAINER USED IN THE TOBACCO INDUSTRY | [2006/32] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MANIPULATION POUR RECIPIENT UTILISE DANS L'INDUSTRIE DU TABAC | [2006/32] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/32] | 04.07.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.10.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 13.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 05.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/48] | 07.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/48] | Divisional application(s) | EP06008754.1 / EP1690458 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE19745852 (INDAG GESELLSCHAFT FUER INDUSTRIEBEDARF MBH, 69214 EPPELHEIM, DE; INDA) [X] 1-8,10 * figure 2 *; | [X]US4532946 (KING, JR. ET AL) [X] 1-8,10 * figure 6 * | Examination | US5622468 | GB2355705 | FR2704538 |