EP1687550 - HYDRAULIC MOUNT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.2010 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carl Freudenberg KG Höhnerweg 2-4 69469 Weinheim / DE | [2006/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MÜHLEMEIER, Jochen Fasanenweg 4a 85221 Dachau / DE | 02 /
LODERER, Dirk 35 Mulberry Lane Bedford, NH 03110 / US | 03 /
PACHTA, Jiri Südring 33 69514 Laudenbach / DE | [2006/32] | Representative(s) | Ripper, Monika Sigrid Carl Freudenberg KG Höhnerweg 2 - 4 69469 Weinheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/32] | Ripper, Monika Sigrid Carl Freudenberg KG, Patente und Marken 69465 Weinheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 04803338.5 | 29.11.2004 | [2006/32] | WO2004EP13527 | Priority number, date | DE2003155501 | 27.11.2003 Original published format: DE 10355501 | [2006/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005052407 | Date: | 09.06.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1687550 | Date: | 09.08.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1687550 | Date: | 29.07.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F16F13/08 | [2006/32] | CPC: |
F16F13/108 (EP);
F16F1/3605 (EP);
F16F2222/02 (EP);
F16F2224/025 (EP);
F16F2224/04 (EP);
F16F2228/002 (EP);
F16F2228/005 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HYDROLAGER | [2006/32] | English: | HYDRAULIC MOUNT | [2006/32] | French: | SUPPORT HYDRAULIQUE | [2006/32] | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/32] | 06.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 29.07.2009 | CZ | 29.07.2009 | DK | 29.07.2009 | EE | 29.07.2009 | FI | 29.07.2009 | IE | 29.07.2009 | IT | 29.07.2009 | NL | 29.07.2009 | PL | 29.07.2009 | RO | 29.07.2009 | SE | 29.07.2009 | SI | 29.07.2009 | SK | 29.07.2009 | TR | 29.07.2009 | BG | 29.10.2009 | GR | 30.10.2009 | ES | 09.11.2009 | AT | 29.11.2009 | IS | 29.11.2009 | LU | 29.11.2009 | PT | 29.11.2009 | BE | 30.11.2009 | CH | 30.11.2009 | LI | 30.11.2009 | MC | 30.11.2009 | HU | 30.01.2010 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | CZ | 29.07.2009 | |
DK | 29.07.2009 | ||
EE | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
IE | 29.07.2009 | ||
IT | 29.07.2009 | ||
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
PL | 29.07.2009 | ||
RO | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
SK | 29.07.2009 | ||
BG | 29.10.2009 | ||
GR | 30.10.2009 | ||
ES | 09.11.2009 | ||
AT | 29.11.2009 | ||
IS | 29.11.2009 | ||
LU | 29.11.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
BE | 30.11.2009 | ||
CH | 30.11.2009 | ||
LI | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
HU | 30.01.2010 | ||
Former [2011/21] | CZ | 29.07.2009 | |
DK | 29.07.2009 | ||
EE | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
IE | 29.07.2009 | ||
IT | 29.07.2009 | ||
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
PL | 29.07.2009 | ||
RO | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
SK | 29.07.2009 | ||
BG | 29.10.2009 | ||
GR | 30.10.2009 | ||
ES | 09.11.2009 | ||
AT | 29.11.2009 | ||
IS | 29.11.2009 | ||
LU | 29.11.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
BE | 30.11.2009 | ||
CH | 30.11.2009 | ||
LI | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/15] | CZ | 29.07.2009 | |
DK | 29.07.2009 | ||
EE | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
IE | 29.07.2009 | ||
IT | 29.07.2009 | ||
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
PL | 29.07.2009 | ||
RO | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
SK | 29.07.2009 | ||
BG | 29.10.2009 | ||
GR | 30.10.2009 | ||
ES | 09.11.2009 | ||
AT | 29.11.2009 | ||
IS | 29.11.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
BE | 30.11.2009 | ||
CH | 30.11.2009 | ||
LI | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/08] | CZ | 29.07.2009 | |
DK | 29.07.2009 | ||
EE | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
IE | 29.07.2009 | ||
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
PL | 29.07.2009 | ||
RO | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
SK | 29.07.2009 | ||
BG | 29.10.2009 | ||
GR | 30.10.2009 | ||
ES | 09.11.2009 | ||
AT | 29.11.2009 | ||
IS | 29.11.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
BE | 30.11.2009 | ||
CH | 30.11.2009 | ||
LI | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/51] | CZ | 29.07.2009 | |
DK | 29.07.2009 | ||
EE | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
IE | 29.07.2009 | ||
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
PL | 29.07.2009 | ||
RO | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
SK | 29.07.2009 | ||
BG | 29.10.2009 | ||
GR | 30.10.2009 | ||
ES | 09.11.2009 | ||
IS | 29.11.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
BE | 30.11.2009 | ||
CH | 30.11.2009 | ||
LI | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/46] | CZ | 29.07.2009 | |
DK | 29.07.2009 | ||
EE | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
IE | 29.07.2009 | ||
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
PL | 29.07.2009 | ||
RO | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
SK | 29.07.2009 | ||
BG | 29.10.2009 | ||
GR | 30.10.2009 | ||
ES | 09.11.2009 | ||
IS | 29.11.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
CH | 30.11.2009 | ||
LI | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/30] | CZ | 29.07.2009 | |
DK | 29.07.2009 | ||
EE | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
IE | 29.07.2009 | ||
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
PL | 29.07.2009 | ||
RO | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
SK | 29.07.2009 | ||
BG | 29.10.2009 | ||
ES | 09.11.2009 | ||
IS | 29.11.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | CZ | 29.07.2009 | |
DK | 29.07.2009 | ||
EE | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
IE | 29.07.2009 | ||
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
PL | 29.07.2009 | ||
RO | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
SK | 29.07.2009 | ||
BG | 29.10.2009 | ||
ES | 09.11.2009 | ||
IS | 29.11.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/22] | CZ | 29.07.2009 | |
DK | 29.07.2009 | ||
EE | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
IE | 29.07.2009 | ||
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
PL | 29.07.2009 | ||
RO | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
BG | 29.10.2009 | ||
ES | 09.11.2009 | ||
IS | 29.11.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | DK | 29.07.2009 | |
EE | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
IE | 29.07.2009 | ||
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
PL | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
BG | 29.10.2009 | ||
ES | 09.11.2009 | ||
IS | 29.11.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | FI | 29.07.2009 | |
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
PL | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
BG | 29.10.2009 | ||
ES | 09.11.2009 | ||
IS | 29.11.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | FI | 29.07.2009 | |
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
PL | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
ES | 09.11.2009 | ||
IS | 29.11.2009 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US5215293 (MURAMATSU ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,3-5 * column 5, lines 9-12 * * figure 1 * [Y] 2; | [Y]DE4324832 (WOLF WOCO & CO FRANZ J [DE]) [Y] 2 * column 1, lines 9-14 * * column 1, lines 28-43 * * column 2, lines 7-10 *; | [A]US2003025255 (GADE PRASAD V [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0030] ** figure 2 * |