EP1754340 - SERVICE DEPENDENT SHARED PHYSICAL CHANNEL MAPPING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.08.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [2007/08] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006 Oaza Kadoma, Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WENGERTER, Christian Bahnhofstrasse 10d 63924 Kleinheubach / DE | 02 /
SEIDEL, Eiko Monzastrasse 4c 63225 Langen / DE | [2007/17] |
Former [2007/08] | 01 /
WENGERTER, Christian Bahnhofstrasse 10d 63924 Kleinheubach / DE | ||
02 /
SEIDEL, Eiko Moosbergstrasse 97a-b 64285 Darmstadt / DE | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/08] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04803498.7 | 03.12.2004 | [2007/08] | WO2004EP13776 | Priority number, date | EP20040013495 | 08.06.2004 Original published format: EP 04013495 | [2007/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005122496 | Date: | 22.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1754340 | Date: | 21.02.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/56 | [2007/08] | CPC: |
H04L47/2416 (EP,US);
H04L47/10 (US);
H04L47/2441 (EP,US);
H04L47/2491 (EP,US);
H04W28/02 (EP);
H04W8/04 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/08] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DIENSTABHÄNGIGE ABBILDUNG GEMEINSAM BENUTZTER PHYSIKALISCHER KANÄLE | [2007/08] | English: | SERVICE DEPENDENT SHARED PHYSICAL CHANNEL MAPPING | [2007/08] | French: | MAPPAGE DE VOIE PHYSIQUE PARTAGEE DEPENDANT DU SERVICE | [2007/08] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/08] | 22.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/39] | 08.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2007 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2003203736 (CHI ZHENTAO [CN], et al) [X] 1-21 * abstract * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0099] - paragraph [0181] *; | [A]US2003208582 (PERSSON FREDRIK [SE], et al) [A] 1-21 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0076]; figures 4-8 *; | [A] - ARNDT KADELKA, ARNO MASELLA, "Serving IP quality of service with HiperLAN/2", COMPUTER NETWORKS: THE INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF COMPUTER AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS NETWORKING, ELSEVIER NORTH-HOLLAND, INC. NEW YORK, NY, USA, vol. 37, ISSN 1389-1286, (200109), pages 17 - 24, URL: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1389-1286(01)00195-5, (20041025), XP002302534 [A] 1-21 * the whole document * |