EP1694728 - COPOLYMERS BASED ON TERT-BUTYL(METH)ACRYLATE AND USE THEREOF IN HAIRSPRAYS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/35] | COPOLYMERS BASED ON TERT-BUTYL(METH)ACRYLATE AND USE THEREOF | ||
[2008/07] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.06.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 22.12.2010 [2010/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/10] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2006/35] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NGUYEN-KIM, Son Zedernweg 9 69502 Hemsbach / DE | 02 /
WOOD, Claudia Nibelungenstrasse 5 69469 Weinheim / DE | [2006/35] | Representative(s) | Reitstötter Kinzebach Patentanwälte Im Zollhof 1 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/35] | Reitstötter - Kinzebach Ludwigsplatz 4 67059 Ludwigshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 04803650.3 | 08.12.2004 | [2006/35] | WO2004EP13984 | Priority number, date | DE2003157486 | 09.12.2003 Original published format: DE 10357486 | [2006/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005058989 | Date: | 30.06.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1694728 | Date: | 30.08.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1694728 | Date: | 13.08.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61Q5/06, C08F220/54 | [2008/07] | CPC: |
C08F226/02 (EP,KR,US);
C08F220/54 (KR);
A61K8/8158 (EP,KR,US);
A61Q1/02 (EP,KR,US);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
A61Q19/007 (EP,KR,US);
A61Q19/04 (EP,KR,US);
A61Q19/10 (EP,KR,US);
A61Q3/00 (EP,KR,US);
A61Q5/006 (EP,KR,US);
A61Q5/02 (EP,KR,US);
A61Q5/06 (EP,US);
A61Q5/065 (EP,KR,US);
A61Q5/12 (EP,KR,US);
C08F220/06 (EP,KR,US);
C08F220/18 (KR);
C08F220/1804 (EP,US);
A61Q15/00 (EP,US);
C08F220/1802 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/35] | C08F220/54 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | COPOLYMERE AUF BASIS VON TERT.-BUTYL(METH)ACRYLAT UND DEREN VERWENDUNG IN HAARSPRAYS | [2008/07] | English: | COPOLYMERS BASED ON TERT-BUTYL(METH)ACRYLATE AND USE THEREOF IN HAIRSPRAYS | [2008/07] | French: | COPOLYMERES A BASE DE TERT.-BUTYL(METH)ACRYLATE ET LEUR UTILISATION DANS LAQUES A CHEVEUX | [2008/07] |
Former [2006/35] | COPOLYMERE AUF BASIS VON TERT.-BUTYL(METH)ACRYLAT UND DEREN VERWENDUNG | ||
Former [2006/35] | COPOLYMERS BASED ON TERT-BUTYL(METH)ACRYLATE AND USE THEREOF | ||
Former [2006/35] | COPOLYMERES A BASE DE TERT.-BUTYL(METH)ACRYLATE ET LEUR UTILISATION | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/35] | 19.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 16.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 13.08.2008 | CZ | 13.08.2008 | DK | 13.08.2008 | EE | 13.08.2008 | FI | 13.08.2008 | IE | 13.08.2008 | LT | 13.08.2008 | NL | 13.08.2008 | PL | 13.08.2008 | RO | 13.08.2008 | SI | 13.08.2008 | SK | 13.08.2008 | TR | 13.08.2008 | BG | 13.11.2008 | SE | 13.11.2008 | GR | 14.11.2008 | AT | 08.12.2008 | LU | 08.12.2008 | IS | 13.12.2008 | BE | 31.12.2008 | CH | 31.12.2008 | LI | 31.12.2008 | MC | 31.12.2008 | PT | 13.01.2009 | HU | 14.02.2009 | [2010/51] |
Former [2010/38] | CY | 13.08.2008 | |
CZ | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IE | 13.08.2008 | ||
LT | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
PL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
TR | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
SE | 13.11.2008 | ||
AT | 08.12.2008 | ||
LU | 08.12.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | ||
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
HU | 14.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/36] | CY | 13.08.2008 | |
CZ | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IE | 13.08.2008 | ||
LT | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
PL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
SE | 13.11.2008 | ||
AT | 08.12.2008 | ||
LU | 08.12.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | ||
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
HU | 14.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/33] | CZ | 13.08.2008 | |
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IE | 13.08.2008 | ||
LT | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
PL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
SE | 13.11.2008 | ||
AT | 08.12.2008 | ||
LU | 08.12.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | ||
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/30] | CZ | 13.08.2008 | |
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IE | 13.08.2008 | ||
LT | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
PL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
SE | 13.11.2008 | ||
AT | 08.12.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | ||
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/24] | CZ | 13.08.2008 | |
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IE | 13.08.2008 | ||
LT | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
PL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
SE | 13.11.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | ||
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | CZ | 13.08.2008 | |
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IE | 13.08.2008 | ||
LT | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
SE | 13.11.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | ||
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | CZ | 13.08.2008 | |
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IE | 13.08.2008 | ||
LT | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | ||
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/44] | CZ | 13.08.2008 | |
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IE | 13.08.2008 | ||
LT | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | ||
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | CZ | 13.08.2008 | |
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IE | 13.08.2008 | ||
LT | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/35] | CZ | 13.08.2008 | |
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IE | 13.08.2008 | ||
LT | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | CZ | 13.08.2008 | |
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IE | 13.08.2008 | ||
LT | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/24] | CZ | 13.08.2008 | |
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IE | 13.08.2008 | ||
LT | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | DK | 13.08.2008 | |
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
LT | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | FI | 13.08.2008 | |
LT | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | FI | 13.08.2008 | |
LT | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | LT | 13.08.2008 | |
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | Cited in | International search | [X]US3632838 (WILHELM HANS, et al) [X] 1-24 * example 3 *; | [X]US3927199 (MICCHELLI ALBERT L, et al) [X] 1-32 * example 4; claims 1-3 *; | [X]US4748989 (NUBER ADOLF [DE], et al) [X] 1-32* table - *; | [X]US5025062 (LEY GREGOR [DE], et al) [X] 1-24 * table 1 *; | [DX]DE4314305 (BASF AG [DE]) [DX] 1-32 * claim - * * examples 5-11 * |