09.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] |
28.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
21.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.06.2021 [2021/25] |
13.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.12.2020 [2020/51] |
30.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.12.2020 [2020/49] |
09.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] |
21.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.09.2020 [2020/39] |
31.07.2020 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] |
22.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.06.2020 [2020/26] |
15.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.06.2020 [2020/25] |
08.05.2020 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2020 [2020/24] |
24.04.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.05.2020 [2020/22] |
17.04.2020 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 20.05.2020 [2020/21] |
28.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.04.2020 [2020/14] |
21.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13] |
14.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12] |
07.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] |
31.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.03.2020 [2020/10] |
10.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.02.2020 [2020/07] |
05.12.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01] |
15.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] |
01.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] |
25.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] |
18.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] |
10.05.2019 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24] |
29.03.2019 |
Change - applicant |
published on 01.05.2019 [2019/18] |
26.03.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
26.03.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
25.03.2019 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
06.01.2019 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
14.12.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 16.01.2019 [2019/03] |
14.12.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 16.01.2019 [2019/03] |
11.12.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.05.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
08.03.2018 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
12.12.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.11.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
10.01.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.01.2016 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
11.01.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.09.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.02.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
10.01.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.01.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.01.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.01.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.11.2011 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
08.11.2011 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
08.11.2011 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
07.11.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
23.08.2011 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
20.05.2011 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.05.2011 |
Deletion: Reply to examination report |
|
20.05.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
12.01.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.01.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
07.01.2011 |
First examination report |
|
27.01.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.01.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.06.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] |
12.01.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.02.2007 |
Change - extension states |
published on 28.03.2007 [2007/13] |
13.01.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.11.2006 |
Change - inventor |
published on 20.12.2006 [2006/51] |
04.08.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.08.2006 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 06.09.2006 [2006/36] |
04.08.2006 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 06.09.2006 [2006/36] |
02.08.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.07.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.06.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.07.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.07.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.03.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|