EP1699704 - A BLANK FOR A CONTAINER AND A CONTAINER MADE FROM SAID BLANK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.11.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEDA S.p.A. Corso Salvatore d'Amato 84 80022 Arzano Napoli / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2006/37] | For all designated states SEDA S.p.A. Corso Salvatore d'Amato 84 I-80022 Arzano-Napoli / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
D'AMATO, Gianfranco Corso Salvatore D'Amato 84 I-80022 Arzano Napoli / IT | [2006/37] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/37] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04804039.8 | 17.12.2004 | [2006/37] | WO2004EP14438 | Priority number, date | DE2003219691U | 18.12.2003 Original published format: DE 20319691 U | [2006/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005058714 | Date: | 30.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1699704 | Date: | 13.09.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B65D3/06 | [2006/37] | CPC: |
B65D3/06 (EP,KR,US);
B65D3/00 (KR);
B65D85/72 (EP,KR,US);
B65D2203/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSCHNITT FÜR EINEN BEHÄLTER UND AUS DEM ZUSCHNITT HERGESTELLTER BEHÄLTER | [2006/37] | English: | A BLANK FOR A CONTAINER AND A CONTAINER MADE FROM SAID BLANK | [2006/37] | French: | EBAUCHE POUR CONTENANT ET CONTENANT RESULTANT | [2006/37] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/37] | 02.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/51] | 06.08.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2012 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US1520870 (KOCH LYDIA B) [A] 1,12 * page 1, line 10 - line 20; figures 1-5 * * the whole document *; | [A]US5586689 (D AMATO ANTONIO [IT]) [A] * abstract *; | [A]FR2813861 (BONAN ALBERT [FR]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]WO0247523 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP]) [A] * abstract *; | [A]DE20310623U (SEDA SPA [IT]) [A] 1,12 * the whole document * |