EP1683259 - ELECTRONICALLY COMMUTATED MOTOR AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.2010 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ebm-papst St. Georgen GmbH & Co. KG Hermann-Papst-Strasse 1 78112 St. Georgen / DE | [2006/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DORNHOF, Konstantin Beethovenstrasse 27 78194 Immendingen / DE | [2006/30] | Representative(s) | Raible, Tobias Raible & Raible Patentanwälte Bolzstrasse 3 70173 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/30] | Raible, Tobias Raible & Raible Schoderstrasse 10 70192 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 04804348.3 | 28.12.2004 | [2006/30] | WO2004EP14759 | Priority number, date | DE20041006449 | 03.02.2004 Original published format: DE102004006449 | [2006/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005076456 | Date: | 18.08.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1683259 | Date: | 26.07.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1683259 | Date: | 30.09.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H02P6/00, H02P6/08, H02P6/10 | [2006/30] | CPC: |
H02P6/10 (EP,US);
H02P6/08 (EP);
H02P6/085 (EP,US);
H02P6/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCH KOMMUTIERTER MOTOR UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINES SOLCHEN | [2006/30] | English: | ELECTRONICALLY COMMUTATED MOTOR AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE SAME | [2006/30] | French: | MOTEUR A COMMUTATION ELECTRONIQUE, ET PROCEDE POUR LE COMMANDER | [2006/30] | Entry into regional phase | 03.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 03.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.08.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.06.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/30] | 16.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 30.09.2009 | CZ | 30.09.2009 | DK | 30.09.2009 | EE | 30.09.2009 | FI | 30.09.2009 | IE | 30.09.2009 | LT | 30.09.2009 | NL | 30.09.2009 | PL | 30.09.2009 | RO | 30.09.2009 | SE | 30.09.2009 | SI | 30.09.2009 | SK | 30.09.2009 | TR | 30.09.2009 | AT | 28.12.2009 | LU | 28.12.2009 | BE | 31.12.2009 | BG | 31.12.2009 | CH | 31.12.2009 | GR | 31.12.2009 | LI | 31.12.2009 | ES | 10.01.2010 | IS | 30.01.2010 | PT | 01.02.2010 | HU | 01.04.2010 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | CY | 30.09.2009 | |
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
IE | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
AT | 28.12.2009 | ||
LU | 28.12.2009 | ||
BE | 31.12.2009 | ||
BG | 31.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
GR | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
HU | 01.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/21] | CY | 30.09.2009 | |
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
IE | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
LU | 28.12.2009 | ||
BE | 31.12.2009 | ||
BG | 31.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
GR | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | CY | 30.09.2009 | |
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
IE | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
BE | 31.12.2009 | ||
BG | 31.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
GR | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/51] | CY | 30.09.2009 | |
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
IE | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
BE | 31.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
GR | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | CY | 30.09.2009 | |
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
IE | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/33] | CY | 30.09.2009 | |
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CY | 30.09.2009 | |
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/23] | CZ | 30.09.2009 | |
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/22] | CZ | 30.09.2009 | |
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/20] | EE | 30.09.2009 | |
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | FI | 30.09.2009 | |
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/11] | FI | 30.09.2009 | |
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0572162 (SGS THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS [US]); | [X]EP0892492 (ZENTR MIKROELEKT DRESDEN GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-5 * column 4, line 36 - column 5, line 54; figures 1,2 *; | [X]EP0986167 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [X] 1-5 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0030]; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US6377109 (YAMA MICHIAKI [JP]) |