EP1699795 - SUBSTITUTED 8'-PYRI(MI)DINYL-DIHYDROSPIRO-[CYCLOALKLYMINE]-PYRIMIDO[1,2A]PYRIMIDIN-6-ONE DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/37] | SUBSTITUTED 8'-PYRI(MI)DINYL-DIHYDROSPIRO-[CYCLOALKLYMINE]-PYRIMIDO[1,2a]PYRIMIDIN-6-ONE DERIVATIVES | ||
[2006/41] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.02.2008 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 25.12.2013 [2013/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanofi-Aventis 174, Avenue de France 75013 Paris / FR | For all designated states Mitsubishi Pharma Corporation 6-9, Hiranomachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0046 / JP | [2006/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEREZE, Nathalie 60 bis Boulevard du Maréchal Joffre F-92340 Bourg La Reine / FR | 02 /
LOCHEAD, Alistair 95, rue de Paris F-94220 Charenton le Pont / FR | 03 /
SAADY, Mourad 1 avenue du Général Dodds F-75012 Paris / FR | 04 /
SLOWINSKI, Franck 41, Grande Rue F-77230 Thieux / FR | 05 /
YAICHE, Philippe 2, place Marc Sangnier F-93260 Les Lilas / FR | [2006/37] | Representative(s) | Morel-Pécheux, Muriel Sanofi Département Brevets 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/37] | Morel-Pécheux, Muriel sanofi-aventis Département Brevets 174 Avenue de France 75013 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 04804431.7 | 17.12.2004 | [2006/37] | WO2004EP14846 | Priority number, date | EP20030293236 | 19.12.2003 Original published format: EP 03293236 | [2006/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005058908 | Date: | 30.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1699795 | Date: | 13.09.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1699795 | Date: | 25.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/04, A61K31/505, A61P25/28 | [2006/47] | CPC: |
A61P3/04 (EP);
C07D487/04 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/527 (US);
A61K31/397 (US);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/14 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2006/37] | C07D487/04, A61K31/505, A61P25/28, // C07D487/04, C07D239/00, C07D239/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/37] | Extension states | AL | 19.07.2006 | BA | 19.07.2006 | HR | 19.07.2006 | LV | 19.07.2006 | MK | 19.07.2006 | YU | 19.07.2006 | Title | German: | SUBSTITUIERTE 8'-PYRI(MI)DINYL-DIHYDROSPIRO-[CYCLOALKYLAMIN]-PYRIMIDO[1,2A]PYRIMIDIN-6-ONDERIVATE | [2006/37] | English: | SUBSTITUTED 8'-PYRI(MI)DINYL-DIHYDROSPIRO-[CYCLOALKLYMINE]-PYRIMIDO[1,2A]PYRIMIDIN-6-ONE DERIVATIVES | [2006/41] | French: | DERIVES DE 8'-PYRI(MI)DINYL-DIHYDROSPIRO-[CYCLOAKLYAMINE]-PYRIMIDO[1,2-A]PYRIMIDIN-6-ONE SUBSTITUES | [2006/41] |
Former [2006/37] | SUBSTITUTED 8'-PYRI(MI)DINYL-DIHYDROSPIRO-[CYCLOALKLYMINE]-PYRIMIDO[1,2a]PYRIMIDIN-6-ONE DERIVATIVES | ||
Former [2006/37] | DERIVES DE 8'-PYRI(MI)DINYL-DIHYDROSPIRO-CYCLOAKLYAMINEss]-PYRIMIDO[1,2-A]PYRIMIDIN-6-ONE SUBSTITUES | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/37] | 30.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0218386 (SANOFI SYNTHELABO [FR], et al) [A] 1-13 * claims 1,7 *; | [A]EP1295885 (SANOFI SYNTHELABO [FR], et al) [A] 1-13 * claims 1,6 *; | [A]EP1295884 (SANOFI SYNTHELABO [FR], et al) [A] 1-13* claims 1,6 *; | [A]WO03027116 (SANOFI SYNTHELABO [FR], et al) [A] 1-13 * claims 1,7 *; | [A]WO03027115 (SANOFI SYNTHELABO [FR], et al) [A] 1-13 * claims 1,7 *; | [A]EP1340761 (SANOFI SYNTHELABO [FR], et al) [A] 1-13 * claims 1,7 *; | [A]EP1340760 (SANOFI SYNTHELABO [FR], et al) [A] 1-13 * claims 1,7 * |