EP1692792 - CIRCUIT AND METHOD FOR SYNCHRONIZING CLOCK PULSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.04.2008 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Siemens Networks GmbH & Co. KG St. Martin Strasse 76 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/50] | For all designated states NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS GMBH & CO. KG St. Martin Strasse 76 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/46] | For all designated states NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS S.P.A. St. Martin Strasse 76 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/37] | For all designated states NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS GMBH & CO. KG St. Martin Strasse 76 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/34] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIPP, Imre Karl Witthalm Str. 42 81375 München / DE | [2006/34] | Application number, filing date | 04804601.5 | 29.11.2004 | [2006/34] | WO2004EP53154 | Priority number, date | DE2003157477 | 09.12.2003 Original published format: DE 10357477 | [2006/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005060133 | Date: | 30.06.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1692792 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04J3/06, H04L25/49, H04L25/493, H04L5/02 | [2006/34] | CPC: |
H04L25/493 (EP,US);
H04J3/0688 (EP,US);
H04L25/4902 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/12] |
Former [2006/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHALTUNGSANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR TAKTSYNCHRONISATION | [2006/34] | English: | CIRCUIT AND METHOD FOR SYNCHRONIZING CLOCK PULSES | [2006/34] | French: | CIRCUITERIE ET PROCEDE DE SYNCHRONISATION D'HORLOGE | [2006/34] | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/34] | 01.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/22] | 15.01.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0376335 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [X] 13-15,17,19-21 * abstract ** column 1 - column 3 *; | [X]US5673004 (PARK JUNG-HEE [KR]) [X] 1-22 * abstract * * column 4, line 26 - line 59 * * figures 2,3,6 *; | [X]US6144674 (PERES MAURICIO [CA], et al) [X] 1,9,13,20,21 * abstract * * column 1, line 5 - line 56 * * column 2, line 15 - line 40 * * column 3, line 30 - line 52 * * figure 1 *; | [X]US6233238 (ROMANOWSKI ALEXANDER [DE], et al) [X] 1,9,13,20,21 * abstract * * the whole document * * figure 1 * |