EP1711307 - SYSTEM COMPRISING A CHIP COLLECTOR AND A PROTECTIVE HOOD FOR A MACHINE TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/42] | CHIP COLLECTOR, AND SYSTEM COMPRISING A CHIP COLLECTOR AND A PROTECTIVE HOOD FOR A MACHINE TOOL | ||
[2007/46] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.12.2008 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.01.2009 [2009/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2006/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROEHM, Heiko Ludwigstrasse 50 70176 Stuttgart / DE | 02 /
WEBER, Steffen Albweg 18 70794 Filderstadt / DE | [2006/42] | Representative(s) | Daub, Thomas Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Daub Bahnhofstrasse 5 88662 Überlingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/46] | Daub, Thomas Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Daub Seepromenade 17 88662 Überlingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 04804806.0 | 14.12.2004 | [2006/42] | WO2004EP53446 | Priority number, date | DE20041004003 | 27.01.2004 Original published format: DE102004004003 | [2006/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005070617 | Date: | 04.08.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1711307 | Date: | 18.10.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1711307 | Date: | 20.02.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q11/00, B23D59/00, B27B9/00 | [2006/42] | CPC: |
B23D59/006 (EP,US);
B23Q11/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/18] |
Former [2006/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM AUS EINEM SPANAUFFANGBEHÄLTER UND EINER SCHUTZHAUBE FÜR EINE WERKZEUGMASCHINE | [2007/46] | English: | SYSTEM COMPRISING A CHIP COLLECTOR AND A PROTECTIVE HOOD FOR A MACHINE TOOL | [2007/46] | French: | SYSTEME COMPRENANT UN COLLECTEUR DE COPEAUX ET UN CAPOT PROTECTEUR POUR UNE MACHINE-OUTIL | [2007/46] |
Former [2006/42] | SPANAUFFANGBEHÄLTER SOWIE SYSTEM AUS EINEM SPANAUFFANGBEHÄLTER UND EINER SCHUTZHAUBE FÜR EINE WERKZEUGMASCHINE | ||
Former [2006/42] | CHIP COLLECTOR, AND SYSTEM COMPRISING A CHIP COLLECTOR AND A PROTECTIVE HOOD FOR A MACHINE TOOL | ||
Former [2006/42] | COLLECTEUR DE COPEAUX, ET SYSTEME COMPRENANT UN COLLECTEUR DE COPEAUX ET UN CAPOT PROTECTEUR POUR UNE MACHINE-OUTIL | Entry into regional phase | 28.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 28.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/42] | 30.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 28.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4675999 (ITO MASANORI [JP], et al) [X] 1-12 * figures 3,6,7,9 *; | [X]US5675895 (MORI TAKASHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-12 * figures 3,4 *; | [A]DE3542263 (FESTO KG [DE]) [A] 1,6,7,10-12 * abstract *; | [A]EP0503465 (REICH SPEZIALMASCHINEN GMBH [DE]) [A] 10-12 * figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [A]GB523220 (RICHARD GARRETT ENGINEERING WO, et al) [A] 10-12 * page 2, line 107 - page 3, line 9; figure . * |