EP1839372 - PRODUCTION PROCESSES FOR A SYSTEM FOR CONTACTING ELECTRONIC DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/40] | A SYSTEM FOR CONTACTING ELECTRONIC DEVICES AND PRODUCTION PROCESSES THEREOF | ||
[2011/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.05.2012 Database last updated on 26.04.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eles Semiconductor Equipment S.P.A. Fraz. Pian di Porto, Zona Ind.le Bodoglie, 148/1/Z 06059 Todi (Perugia) / IT | For all designated states Rise Technology S.r.l. Via Orazio, 8/b 00040 Pomezia / IT | [2007/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BALUCANI, Marco Via Marmolada, 20 I-65016 Montesilvano / IT | [2007/40] | Representative(s) | Pezzoli, Ennio, et al c/o Maccalli & Pezzoli S.r.l. Via Settembrini 40 20124 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Pezzoli, Ennio, et al c/o Maccalli & Pezzoli S.r.l. Via Settembrini 40 20124 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2007/40] | Pezzoli, Ennio, et al Maccalli & Pezzoli S.r.l. Via Settembrini 40 20124 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 04804971.2 | 21.12.2004 | [2007/40] | WO2004EP53637 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006066620 | Date: | 29.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1839372 | Date: | 03.10.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1839372 | Date: | 13.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/24 | [2007/40] | CPC: |
H01R13/2414 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EIN SYSTEM ZUM KONTAKTIEREN VON ELEKTRONISCHEN VORRICHTUNGEN | [2011/01] | English: | PRODUCTION PROCESSES FOR A SYSTEM FOR CONTACTING ELECTRONIC DEVICES | [2011/01] | French: | PROCEDES DE PRODUCTION D'UN SYSTEME DE MISE EN CONTACT DE DISPOSITIFS ELECTRONIQUES | [2011/01] |
Former [2007/40] | SYSTEM ZUM KONTAKTIEREN VON ELEKTRONISCHEN VORRICHTUNGEN UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | ||
Former [2007/40] | A SYSTEM FOR CONTACTING ELECTRONIC DEVICES AND PRODUCTION PROCESSES THEREOF | ||
Former [2007/40] | SYSTEME DE MISE EN CONTACT DE DISPOSITIFS ELECTRONIQUES, ET PROCEDES DE PRODUCTION DU SYSTEME | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/40] | 19.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.11.2007 | Opposition(s) | 16.04.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.07.2011 | BE | 13.07.2011 | CY | 13.07.2011 | CZ | 13.07.2011 | DK | 13.07.2011 | EE | 13.07.2011 | FI | 13.07.2011 | HU | 13.07.2011 | LT | 13.07.2011 | NL | 13.07.2011 | PL | 13.07.2011 | RO | 13.07.2011 | SE | 13.07.2011 | SI | 13.07.2011 | SK | 13.07.2011 | TR | 13.07.2011 | BG | 13.10.2011 | GR | 14.10.2011 | ES | 24.10.2011 | IS | 13.11.2011 | PT | 14.11.2011 | IE | 21.12.2011 | LU | 21.12.2011 | CH | 31.12.2011 | LI | 31.12.2011 | MC | 31.12.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
BE | 13.07.2011 | ||
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2011 | ||
DK | 13.07.2011 | ||
EE | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
NL | 13.07.2011 | ||
PL | 13.07.2011 | ||
RO | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
SI | 13.07.2011 | ||
SK | 13.07.2011 | ||
TR | 13.07.2011 | ||
BG | 13.10.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
ES | 24.10.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
IE | 21.12.2011 | ||
LU | 21.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
BE | 13.07.2011 | ||
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2011 | ||
DK | 13.07.2011 | ||
EE | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
NL | 13.07.2011 | ||
PL | 13.07.2011 | ||
RO | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
SI | 13.07.2011 | ||
SK | 13.07.2011 | ||
BG | 13.10.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
ES | 24.10.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
IE | 21.12.2011 | ||
LU | 21.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
BE | 13.07.2011 | ||
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2011 | ||
DK | 13.07.2011 | ||
EE | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
NL | 13.07.2011 | ||
PL | 13.07.2011 | ||
RO | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
SI | 13.07.2011 | ||
SK | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
ES | 24.10.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
IE | 21.12.2011 | ||
LU | 21.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
BE | 13.07.2011 | ||
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2011 | ||
DK | 13.07.2011 | ||
EE | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
NL | 13.07.2011 | ||
PL | 13.07.2011 | ||
RO | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
SI | 13.07.2011 | ||
SK | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
ES | 24.10.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
IE | 21.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/49] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
BE | 13.07.2011 | ||
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2011 | ||
DK | 13.07.2011 | ||
EE | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
NL | 13.07.2011 | ||
PL | 13.07.2011 | ||
RO | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
SI | 13.07.2011 | ||
SK | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
IE | 21.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
BE | 13.07.2011 | ||
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2011 | ||
DK | 13.07.2011 | ||
EE | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
NL | 13.07.2011 | ||
PL | 13.07.2011 | ||
RO | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
SI | 13.07.2011 | ||
SK | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
IE | 21.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/33] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
BE | 13.07.2011 | ||
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2011 | ||
DK | 13.07.2011 | ||
EE | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
NL | 13.07.2011 | ||
PL | 13.07.2011 | ||
RO | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
SI | 13.07.2011 | ||
SK | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/31] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
BE | 13.07.2011 | ||
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2011 | ||
DK | 13.07.2011 | ||
EE | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
NL | 13.07.2011 | ||
PL | 13.07.2011 | ||
RO | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
SI | 13.07.2011 | ||
SK | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
BE | 13.07.2011 | ||
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2011 | ||
EE | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
NL | 13.07.2011 | ||
PL | 13.07.2011 | ||
RO | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
SI | 13.07.2011 | ||
SK | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
BE | 13.07.2011 | ||
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
NL | 13.07.2011 | ||
PL | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
SI | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
BE | 13.07.2011 | ||
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
NL | 13.07.2011 | ||
PL | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
SI | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
BE | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
NL | 13.07.2011 | ||
PL | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
SI | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | BE | 13.07.2011 | |
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
NL | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | BE | 13.07.2011 | |
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
NL | 13.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | LT | 13.07.2011 | |
NL | 13.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0295914 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [X] 1,11,13,14 * column 7, line 11 - line 20; figure 4b *; | [A]EP0827190 (IND TECH RES INST [TW]) [A] 1-25 * column 7, line 57 - column 8, line 11 *; | [A]WO9818615 (AUGAT INC [US]) [A] 1-25* abstract *; | [X]US6250933 (KHOURY THEODORE A [US], et al) [X] 1,11,13,14 * column 10, line 26 - line 29; figure 12f *; | [A]US6672876 (TAKEKOSHI KIYOSHI [JP]) [A] 1,11,13,14 * column 7, line 16 - line 18 * |