Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7824634 | Global Dossier | 02.11.2010 | B2 | US2007122326 | 31.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | BE200300683 | 24.12.2003 | WO2004EP53697 | 23.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2004312174B | Global Dossier | 08.04.2010 | B2 | AU2004312174 | 21.07.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | BE200300683 | 24.12.2003 | WO2004EP53697 | 23.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1704114 | Global Dossier | 20.01.2016 | B1 | EP1704114 | 27.09.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | BE200300683 | 24.12.2003 | WO2004EP53697 | 23.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0418185 | 06.08.2013 | B1 | BRPI0418185 | 27.04.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | BE200300683 | 24.12.2003 | WO2004EP53697 | 23.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EG25310 | 11.12.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | BE200300683 | 24.12.2003 | WO2004EP53697 | 23.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2565993T | 08.04.2016 | T3 | Priority number | Date | BE200300683 | 24.12.2003 | WO2004EP53697 | 23.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL176373 | 30.11.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | BE200300683 | 24.12.2003 | WO2004EP53697 | 23.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TNSN06195 | 15.11.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | BE200300683 | 24.12.2003 | WO2004EP53697 | 23.12.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005066070 | Global Dossier | 21.07.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | BE200300683 | 24.12.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BE1015840 | 04.10.2005 | A3 | Priority number | Date | BE200300683 | 24.12.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100537417C | 09.09.2009 | C | CN1898154 | 17.01.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | BE200300683 | 24.12.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MA28295 | 01.11.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | BE200300683 | 24.12.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL1704114T | 30.09.2016 | T3 | Priority number | Date | BE200300683 | 24.12.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2353577 | 27.04.2009 | C2 | RU2006126697 | 27.01.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | BE200300683 | 24.12.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA200606116 | 27.02.2008 | B | Priority number | Date | BE200300683 | 24.12.2003 |