EP1678191 - METHOD FOR THE DIRECT SYNTHESIS OF OLIGORHAMNOSIDES, COMPOSITION COMPRISING OLIGORHAMNOSIDES AND USE THEREOF AS A MEDICAMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 23.03.2011 [2011/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pierre Fabre Dermo-Cosmétique 45, place Abel-Gance 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique 3, rue Michel-Ange 75016 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/33] | For all designated states Pierre Fabre Dermo-Cosmétique 45, place Abel-Gance 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | ||
For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE 3, rue Michel Ange 75016 Paris Cédex / FR | |||
Former [2006/28] | For all designated states Pierre Fabre Dermo-Cosmetique 45, place Abel-Gance 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | ||
For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE 3, rue Michel Ange 75016 Paris Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOULMONT, Jean-Philippe 2 rue Voltaire App.43 F-31520 Ramonville St Agne / FR | 02 /
RICO-LATTES, Isabelle 118, allée de Pierras F-31650 Auzielle / FR | 03 /
PEREZ, Emile 17, allée d'Aspin F-31770 Colomiers / FR | 04 /
BORDAT, Pascal 2, chemin de l'Eglise F-31320 Mervilla / FR | [2006/28] | Representative(s) | Ahner, Francis, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/28] | Ahner, Francis, et al Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris cedex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 04805347.4 | 29.10.2004 | [2006/28] | WO2004FR02793 | Priority number, date | FR20030012796 | 31.10.2003 Original published format: FR 0312796 | [2006/28] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005042553 | Date: | 12.05.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1678191 | Date: | 12.07.2006 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1678191 | Date: | 15.08.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07H3/06, C07H15/04, C08B37/00, A61K31/70, A61K31/715, A61K31/48 | [2006/28] | CPC: |
A61K8/73 (EP,US);
A61K31/48 (EP,US);
A61K31/70 (EP,US);
A61K31/702 (EP,US);
A61K31/715 (EP,US);
A61K8/60 (EP,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
A61Q19/005 (EP,US);
A61Q19/08 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DIREKTEN SYNTHESE VON OLIGORHAMNOSIDEN, OLIGORHAMNOSIDHALTIGE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERWENDUNG DAVON ALS MEDIKAMENT | [2006/28] | English: | METHOD FOR THE DIRECT SYNTHESIS OF OLIGORHAMNOSIDES, COMPOSITION COMPRISING OLIGORHAMNOSIDES AND USE THEREOF AS A MEDICAMENT | [2006/28] | French: | PROCEDE DE SYNTHESE DIRECTE D'OLIGORHAMNOSIDES, COMPOSITION COMPRENANT DES OLIGORHAMNOSIDES ET UTILISATION EN TANT QUE MEDICAMENT | [2006/28] | Entry into regional phase | 05.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/28] | 18.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.08.2007 | CY | 15.08.2007 | CZ | 15.08.2007 | DK | 15.08.2007 | EE | 15.08.2007 | FI | 15.08.2007 | GB | 15.08.2007 | IE | 15.08.2007 | NL | 15.08.2007 | PL | 15.08.2007 | RO | 15.08.2007 | SI | 15.08.2007 | SK | 15.08.2007 | TR | 15.08.2007 | LU | 29.10.2007 | BE | 31.10.2007 | FR | 31.10.2007 | IT | 31.10.2007 | MC | 31.10.2007 | BG | 15.11.2007 | SE | 15.11.2007 | GR | 16.11.2007 | DE | 17.11.2007 | ES | 26.11.2007 | PT | 15.01.2008 | HU | 16.02.2008 | [2011/12] |
Former [2009/44] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
CY | 15.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
EE | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
GB | 15.08.2007 | ||
IE | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
PL | 15.08.2007 | ||
RO | 15.08.2007 | ||
SI | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
TR | 15.08.2007 | ||
LU | 29.10.2007 | ||
BE | 31.10.2007 | ||
FR | 31.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
DE | 17.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
HU | 16.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/41] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
CY | 15.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
EE | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
GB | 15.08.2007 | ||
IE | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
PL | 15.08.2007 | ||
RO | 15.08.2007 | ||
SI | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
LU | 29.10.2007 | ||
BE | 31.10.2007 | ||
FR | 31.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
DE | 17.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
HU | 16.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
CY | 15.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
EE | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
GB | 15.08.2007 | ||
IE | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
PL | 15.08.2007 | ||
RO | 15.08.2007 | ||
SI | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
BE | 31.10.2007 | ||
FR | 31.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
DE | 17.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
CZ | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
EE | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
GB | 15.08.2007 | ||
IE | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
PL | 15.08.2007 | ||
RO | 15.08.2007 | ||
SI | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
BE | 31.10.2007 | ||
FR | 31.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
DE | 17.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
CZ | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
EE | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
GB | 15.08.2007 | ||
IE | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
PL | 15.08.2007 | ||
RO | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
BE | 31.10.2007 | ||
FR | 31.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
DE | 17.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
CZ | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
EE | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
GB | 15.08.2007 | ||
IE | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
PL | 15.08.2007 | ||
RO | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
BE | 31.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
DE | 17.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
CZ | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
GB | 15.08.2007 | ||
IE | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
PL | 15.08.2007 | ||
RO | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
BE | 31.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
DE | 17.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
CZ | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
GB | 15.08.2007 | ||
IE | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
PL | 15.08.2007 | ||
RO | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
DE | 17.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
CZ | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
GB | 15.08.2007 | ||
IE | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
PL | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
DE | 17.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
IE | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
PL | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
DE | 17.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
PL | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
PL | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | FI | 15.08.2007 | |
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | ES | 26.11.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5635612 (KAHNE DANIEL E [US]); | [A] - BEDINI E ET AL, "Oligomerization of a rhamnanic trisaccharide repeating unit of O-chain polysaccharides from phytopathogenic bacteria", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20021202), vol. 43, no. 49, ISSN 0040-4039, pages 8879 - 8882, XP004391857 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(02)02237-2 | [A] - ZHU Y., KONG F. , SYNLETT, (2000), no. 12, pages 1783 - 1787, XP001205161 |