EP1694158 - PROTECTION AND/OR CLEANING DEVICE FOR A BRUSH OR A COMB [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.01.2008 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rojat, Jean-Michel 189, chemin du Crêt des Vignes 38330 Saint Ismier / FR | For all designated states Vaudet, Murielle 12, rue de la Paix 38130 Echirolles / FR | [2006/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAUDET, Murielle 12, rue de la Paix F-38130 Echirolles / FR | [2006/35] | Representative(s) | Casalonga, Axel Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | Casalonga, Axel Bureau Casalonga & Josse Bayerstrasse 71/73 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/35] | Casalonga, Axel Bureau D.A. Casalonga-Josse Bayerstrasse 71/73 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04805487.8 | 19.11.2004 | [2006/35] | WO2004FR02950 | Priority number, date | FR20030013669 | 21.11.2003 Original published format: FR 0313669 | [2006/35] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005051121 | Date: | 09.06.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1694158 | Date: | 30.08.2006 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1694158 | Date: | 21.03.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A46B17/04, A46B17/06 | [2006/35] | CPC: |
A46B17/04 (EP);
A46B2200/1093 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHUTZ- UND/ODER REINIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE BÜRSTE ODER EINEN KAMM | [2006/35] | English: | PROTECTION AND/OR CLEANING DEVICE FOR A BRUSH OR A COMB | [2006/35] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PROTECTION ET/OU DE NETTOYAGE POUR BROSSE OU PEIGNE | [2006/35] | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 19.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/35] | 29.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.12.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.03.2007 | CY | 21.03.2007 | CZ | 21.03.2007 | DK | 21.03.2007 | EE | 21.03.2007 | FI | 21.03.2007 | GB | 21.03.2007 | IE | 21.03.2007 | NL | 21.03.2007 | PL | 21.03.2007 | RO | 21.03.2007 | SI | 21.03.2007 | SK | 21.03.2007 | TR | 21.03.2007 | BG | 21.06.2007 | SE | 21.06.2007 | DE | 22.06.2007 | GR | 22.06.2007 | IS | 21.07.2007 | PT | 21.08.2007 | HU | 22.09.2007 | [2009/44] |
Former [2009/41] | AT | 21.03.2007 | |
CY | 21.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2007 | ||
DK | 21.03.2007 | ||
EE | 21.03.2007 | ||
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
GB | 21.03.2007 | ||
IE | 21.03.2007 | ||
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
PL | 21.03.2007 | ||
RO | 21.03.2007 | ||
SI | 21.03.2007 | ||
SK | 21.03.2007 | ||
BG | 21.06.2007 | ||
SE | 21.06.2007 | ||
DE | 22.06.2007 | ||
GR | 22.06.2007 | ||
IS | 21.07.2007 | ||
PT | 21.08.2007 | ||
HU | 22.09.2007 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 21.03.2007 | |
CY | 21.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2007 | ||
DK | 21.03.2007 | ||
EE | 21.03.2007 | ||
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
GB | 21.03.2007 | ||
IE | 21.03.2007 | ||
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
PL | 21.03.2007 | ||
RO | 21.03.2007 | ||
SI | 21.03.2007 | ||
SK | 21.03.2007 | ||
SE | 21.06.2007 | ||
DE | 22.06.2007 | ||
GR | 22.06.2007 | ||
IS | 21.07.2007 | ||
PT | 21.08.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 21.03.2007 | |
CZ | 21.03.2007 | ||
DK | 21.03.2007 | ||
EE | 21.03.2007 | ||
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
GB | 21.03.2007 | ||
IE | 21.03.2007 | ||
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
PL | 21.03.2007 | ||
RO | 21.03.2007 | ||
SI | 21.03.2007 | ||
SK | 21.03.2007 | ||
SE | 21.06.2007 | ||
DE | 22.06.2007 | ||
GR | 22.06.2007 | ||
IS | 21.07.2007 | ||
PT | 21.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 21.03.2007 | |
CZ | 21.03.2007 | ||
DK | 21.03.2007 | ||
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
GB | 21.03.2007 | ||
IE | 21.03.2007 | ||
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
PL | 21.03.2007 | ||
RO | 21.03.2007 | ||
SI | 21.03.2007 | ||
SK | 21.03.2007 | ||
SE | 21.06.2007 | ||
DE | 22.06.2007 | ||
GR | 22.06.2007 | ||
IS | 21.07.2007 | ||
PT | 21.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | AT | 21.03.2007 | |
CZ | 21.03.2007 | ||
DK | 21.03.2007 | ||
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
GB | 21.03.2007 | ||
IE | 21.03.2007 | ||
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
PL | 21.03.2007 | ||
RO | 21.03.2007 | ||
SI | 21.03.2007 | ||
SK | 21.03.2007 | ||
SE | 21.06.2007 | ||
DE | 22.06.2007 | ||
IS | 21.07.2007 | ||
PT | 21.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 21.03.2007 | |
CZ | 21.03.2007 | ||
DK | 21.03.2007 | ||
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
GB | 21.03.2007 | ||
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
PL | 21.03.2007 | ||
RO | 21.03.2007 | ||
SI | 21.03.2007 | ||
SK | 21.03.2007 | ||
SE | 21.06.2007 | ||
IS | 21.07.2007 | ||
PT | 21.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 21.03.2007 | |
CZ | 21.03.2007 | ||
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
GB | 21.03.2007 | ||
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
PL | 21.03.2007 | ||
RO | 21.03.2007 | ||
SI | 21.03.2007 | ||
SK | 21.03.2007 | ||
SE | 21.06.2007 | ||
IS | 21.07.2007 | ||
PT | 21.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/02] | AT | 21.03.2007 | |
CZ | 21.03.2007 | ||
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
GB | 21.03.2007 | ||
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
PL | 21.03.2007 | ||
SI | 21.03.2007 | ||
SK | 21.03.2007 | ||
SE | 21.06.2007 | ||
IS | 21.07.2007 | ||
PT | 21.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | AT | 21.03.2007 | |
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
GB | 21.03.2007 | ||
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
PL | 21.03.2007 | ||
SI | 21.03.2007 | ||
SK | 21.03.2007 | ||
SE | 21.06.2007 | ||
IS | 21.07.2007 | ||
PT | 21.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | AT | 21.03.2007 | |
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
PL | 21.03.2007 | ||
SI | 21.03.2007 | ||
SE | 21.06.2007 | ||
IS | 21.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/44] | FI | 21.03.2007 | |
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
PL | 21.03.2007 | ||
SI | 21.03.2007 | ||
SE | 21.06.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]US1437822 (SEYMOUR FRANK A) [A] 1-14* the whole document *; | [A]US2437298 (HEYMAN FANNIE R) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]US5174445 (MULL ROBERT L [US]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2739534 (WALTER HARMUT [DE]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]US6112362 (PARKO NANCY B [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]DE20001462U (VOGT MARION [DE]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [AP]US6675966 (RAY JAMES L [US]) [AP] 1-14 * the whole document * |