EP1697862 - METHOD FOR INDEXING AND IDENTIFYING MULTIMEDIA DOCUMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hologram Industries 22 Avenue de l'Europe, Parc d'Activité Gustave Eiffel Bussy Saint Georges 77607 Marne La Vallee Cedex / FR | [2011/19] |
Former [2006/36] | For all designated states Advestigo 1 rue Royale Bureaux de la Colline 92210 Saint Cloud / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ESSAFI, Hassane 97 Rue de Paris, Résidence de l'Yvette-Bat. 1 91400 ORSAY / FR | 02 /
GUEZOULI, Larbi Résidence les Fonds Fanettes Apt. 13, 8 Rue de la Croix Audienne 91190 Gif sur Yvette / FR | 03 /
SAYAH, Salima c/o Advestigo 1 Avenue de la Terrasse-Bat.5 91198 Gif sur Yvette / FR | 04 /
BEHLOUL, Ali c/o Advestigo 1 Avenue de la Terrasse-Bat.5 91998 Gif sur Yvette / FR | 05 /
MANDRIDAKE, Clarisse 18 rue du Baron de Nivière 91140 Villebon sur Yvette / FR | 06 /
ESSAFI, Louafi 1 Rue Gabriel Josserand 93500 Pantin / FR | [2006/36] | Representative(s) | Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/36] | Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 04805546.1 | 25.11.2004 | [2006/36] | WO2004FR03017 | Priority number, date | FR20030013907 | 27.11.2003 Original published format: FR 0313907 | [2006/36] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005055086 | Date: | 16.06.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1697862 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1697862 | Date: | 18.05.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2006/36] | CPC: |
G06F16/41 (EP,US);
Y10S707/99936 (US);
Y10S707/99937 (US);
Y10S707/99943 (US);
Y10S707/99944 (US);
Y10S707/99945 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM INDIZIEREN UND IDENTIFIZIEREN VON MULTIMEDIA-DOKUMENTEN | [2006/36] | English: | METHOD FOR INDEXING AND IDENTIFYING MULTIMEDIA DOCUMENTS | [2006/36] | French: | PROCEDE D'INDEXATION ET D'IDENTIFICATION DE DOCUMENTS MULTIMEDIAS | [2006/36] | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/36] | 03.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2009 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   19.01.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.05.2011 | CY | 18.05.2011 | CZ | 18.05.2011 | DK | 18.05.2011 | EE | 18.05.2011 | FI | 18.05.2011 | HU | 18.05.2011 | IE | 18.05.2011 | NL | 18.05.2011 | RO | 18.05.2011 | SE | 18.05.2011 | SI | 18.05.2011 | SK | 18.05.2011 | BG | 18.08.2011 | GR | 19.08.2011 | IS | 18.09.2011 | PT | 19.09.2011 | MC | 30.11.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/29] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
IE | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
RO | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
BG | 18.08.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/29] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
IE | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
RO | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
IE | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
RO | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
IE | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
IE | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 18.05.2011 | |
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 18.05.2011 | |
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | PT | 19.09.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A] - Y. CHANG, I. CHOI, J. CHOI, M. KIM, AND V. V. RAGHAVAN, "Conceptual retrieval based on feature clustering of documents", PROCEEDINGS OF ACM SIGIR WORKSHOP ON MATHEMATICAL-FORMAL METHODS IN INFORMATION RETRIEVAL, TAMPERE, FINLAND, (200208), pages 1 - 10, URL: http://www.cacs.louisiana.edu/Publications/Raghavan/CCCK02.pdf, (20040915), XP002297293 [A] 1,2 * abstract * * page 3, paragraph 3; figure 1 * | [A] - DIAMANTINI C ET AL, "A conceptual indexing method for content-based retrieval", DATABASE AND EXPERT SYSTEMS APPLICATIONS, 1999. PROCEEDINGS. TENTH INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON FLORENCE, ITALY 1-3 SEPT. 1999, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19990901), ISBN 0-7695-0281-4, pages 192 - 197, XP010352474 [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - CARRE M ET AL, "INDEXATION AUDIO: UN ETAT DE L'ART STATE OF THE ART IN AUDIO INDEXING", ANNALES DES TELECOMMUNICATIONS - ANNALS OF TELECOMMUNICATIONS, PRESSES POLYTECHNIQUES ET UNIVERSITAIRES ROMANDES, LAUSANNE, CH, (200009), vol. 55, no. 9/10, ISSN 0003-4347, pages 507 - 525, XP000994593 [A] 1 * page 508, column R, paragraph II.1 - page 512, column L, line 6 * | by applicant | - Y. CHANG ET AL., "Conceptual retrieval based on feature clustering of documents", PROCEEDINGS OF ACM SIGIR WORKSHOP ON MATHEMATICAL-FORMAL METHODS IN INFORMATION RETRIEVAL, (200208), pages 1 - 10 |