EP1763371 - NOVEL IMAGING AGENTS COMPRISING CASPASE-3 INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 07.02.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2014 | Refusal of application | published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GE Healthcare Limited Amersham Place Little Chalfont, Buckinghamshire HP7 9NA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/12] | For all designated states GE Healthcare Limited Amersham Place Little Chalfont Buckinghamshire HP7 9NA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HISCOCK, Duncan GE Healthcare Bio-Sciences, White Lion Road Amersham Buckinghamshire HP7 9LL / GB | 02 /
NEWTON, Ben GE Healthcare Bio-Sciences, White Lion Road Amersham Buckinghamshire HP7 9LL / GB | 03 /
GUILBERT, Benedicte GE Healthcare Bio-Sciences, White Lion Road Amersham Buckinghamshire HP7 9LL / GB | [2007/12] | Representative(s) | Canning, Lewis R. GE Healthcare Limited Amersham Place Little Chalfont Buckinghamshire HP7 9NA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/12] | Canning, Lewis R. GE Healthcare Limited Amersham Place Little Chalfont Bucks. HP7 9NA / GB | Application number, filing date | 04805892.9 | 26.11.2004 | [2007/12] | WO2004GB05003 | Priority number, date | GB20030027494 | 26.11.2003 Original published format: GB 0327494 | [2007/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005053752 | Date: | 16.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1763371 | Date: | 21.03.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K51/00, A61K49/00, A61K49/06, A61K49/08, A61K49/10, A61K49/12, A61K49/14, A61K51/02, A61K51/04, A61K51/06, A61K51/08 | [2007/12] | CPC: |
A61K51/0455 (EP,US);
A61K51/04 (KR);
A61K51/0431 (EP,US);
A61K51/0446 (EP,US);
A61K51/0459 (EP,US);
A61K51/08 (KR);
A61K51/088 (EP,US);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P13/08 (EP);
A61P13/10 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/12] | Title | German: | NEUE BILDDARSTELLUNGSMITTEL MIT CASPASE-3-HEMMERN | [2007/12] | English: | NOVEL IMAGING AGENTS COMPRISING CASPASE-3 INHIBITORS | [2007/12] | French: | NOUVEAUX AGENTS D'IMAGERIE COMPRENANT DES INHIBITEURS DE LA CASPASE-3 | [2007/12] | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.06.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.05.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.05.2006 | Examination requested [2007/12] | 20.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.05.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2014/11] | 26.05.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 11.12.2013 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2014/11] | Appeal following examination | 23.07.2009 | Appeal received No. T2017/09 | 25.09.2009 | Statement of grounds filed | 11.12.2013 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 11.12.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.01.2014 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.07.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2013 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DY]WO0189584 (NYCOMED IMAGING AS [NO], et al) [DY] 1-31 * examples 16-18,21 *; | [Y]US6589503 (PIWNICA-WORMS DAVID [US]) [Y] 1-31 * figure 2 * * column 34 - column 37; examples 8-10 *; | [PX]WO2004069773 (MERCK FROSST CANADA INC [CA], et al) [PX] 1-4,14,16-18,26,28,29,31 * figure 1 ** page 3, paragraph 3; claim 12 *; | [DXY] - HABERKORN UWE; KINSCHERF RALF; KRAMMER PETER H; MIER WALTER; EISENHUT MICHAEL, "Investigation of a potential scintigraphic marker of apoptosis: Radioiodinated Z-Val-Ala-DL-Asp(O-methyl)-fluoromethyl ketone", NUCLEAR MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY, (200110), vol. 28, no. 7, pages 793 - 798, XP002333221 [DX] 1,3,4,7,10,11,16-18,26-31 * figure 1 * [Y] 1-31 | [T] - DECKWERTH ET AL, "Long-term protection of brain tissue from cerebral ischemia by peripherally administered peptidomimetic caspase inhibitors", DRUG DEVELOPMENT RESEARCH, (200104), vol. 52, no. 4, pages 579 - 586, XP002333222 [T] 1,3,4,7,10,11,16-18,26-31 * page 582; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ddr.1161 | [Y] - BHARATHI ET AL, "Noninvasive real-time imaging of apoptosis.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATE OF AMERICA, (20021224), vol. 99, no. 26, pages 16551 - 16555, XP002333223 [Y] 1-31 * page 16551, column L, paragraph 2 - column R, paragraph 1 * * figures 1,5 * * page 16554, column R, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.252644499 | Examination | - CHENG ET AL, "RELATIONSHIP BETWEEN THE INHIBITION CONSTANT (KI) AND THE CONCENTRATION OF INHIBITOR WHICH CAUSES 50 PER CENT INHIBITION (I50) OF AN ENZYMATIC REACTION", BIOCHEMICAL PHARMACOLOGY, (1973), vol. 22, no. 19, pages 3099 - 3108, XP001106687 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0006-2952(73)90196-2 |