EP1721208 - MULTIFOCAL CONTACT LENSES MANUFACTURED FROM A RESPONSIVE POLYMER GEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.06.2016 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2021 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 29.09.2021 [2021/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Guillon, Michel 8 Caversham Street London SW3 4AH / GB | [2006/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUILLON, Michel 8 Caversham Street London SW3 4AH / GB | 02 /
MAISSA, Cecile Adrienne 3 Acre Road Kingston-Upon-Thames, London KT2 6EF / GB | [2006/46] | Representative(s) | Smaggasgale, Gillian Helen WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/33] | Smaggasgale, Gillian Helen WP Thompson 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | ||
Former [2006/46] | Smaggasgale, Gillian Helen W.P. Thompson & Co, 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04806151.9 | 20.12.2004 | [2006/46] | WO2004GB05350 | Priority number, date | GB20030029507 | 19.12.2003 Original published format: GB 0329507 | [2006/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005059632 | Date: | 30.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1721208 | Date: | 15.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1721208 | Date: | 12.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G02C7/04 | [2015/12] | CPC: |
G02C7/081 (EP,US);
A61F2/16 (GB);
A61L15/60 (GB);
G02B1/043 (GB);
G02B3/10 (EP,US);
G02C7/041 (GB);
|
Former IPC [2006/46] | G02C7/04, G02B3/00, G02C7/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/33] |
Former [2006/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | MULTIFOKAL-KONTAKTLINSEN AUS EINEM ANSPRECHENDEM POLYMERGEL | [2006/46] | English: | MULTIFOCAL CONTACT LENSES MANUFACTURED FROM A RESPONSIVE POLYMER GEL | [2006/46] | French: | VERRES DE CONTACT PROGRESSIFS OBTENUS A PARTIR D'UN GEL POLYMERE DE REACTION | [2006/46] | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 19.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/46] | 23.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 25.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP12178376.5 / EP2518555 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.08.2010 | Opposition(s) | 13.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/29] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 25.03.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 25.03.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.04.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 04.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.12.2004 | AT | 12.08.2015 | BE | 12.08.2015 | BG | 12.08.2015 | CY | 12.08.2015 | CZ | 12.08.2015 | DK | 12.08.2015 | EE | 12.08.2015 | FI | 12.08.2015 | IT | 12.08.2015 | LT | 12.08.2015 | MC | 12.08.2015 | NL | 12.08.2015 | PL | 12.08.2015 | RO | 12.08.2015 | SE | 12.08.2015 | SI | 12.08.2015 | SK | 12.08.2015 | TR | 12.08.2015 | GR | 13.11.2015 | IS | 12.12.2015 | PT | 14.12.2015 | LU | 20.12.2015 | [2021/39] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 20.12.2004 | |
AT | 12.08.2015 | ||
BE | 12.08.2015 | ||
BG | 12.08.2015 | ||
CY | 12.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
TR | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
LU | 20.12.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
BE | 12.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
LU | 20.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
LU | 20.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
LU | 20.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 12.08.2015 | |
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 12.08.2015 | |
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 12.08.2015 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4601545 (KERN SEYMOUR P [US]); | [A]US5066301 (WILEY ROBERT G [US]); | [Y]US5712721 (LARGE TIMOTHY ANDREW [GB]); | [Y]US6619799 (BLUM RONALD D [US], et al) | Examination | WO9706751 | US6388043 | US2003060878 |