EP1708598 - JUICING REAMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2011 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 18.01.2012 [2012/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kenwood Limited New Lane Havant Hampshire PO9 2NH / GB | [2006/52] |
Former [2006/41] | For all designated states KENWOOD MARKS LIMITED New Lane Havant Hampshire PO9 2HN / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goodrick-Meech, Christina, c/o Kenwood Limited New Lane Havant, Hampshire PO9 2NH / GB | [2007/33] |
Former [2006/41] | 01 /
GOODRICK-MEECH, Christina, Kenwood Marks Limited New Lane Havant, Hampshire PO9 2NH / GB | Representative(s) | Marsh, Robin Geoffrey QED Intellectual Property Limited Parchment House 13 Northburgh Street London EC1V 9JP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/41] | Marsh, Robin Geoffrey QED Intellectual Property Limited Harrow Exchange 2 Gayton Road Harrow Middlesex HA1 2XU / GB | Application number, filing date | 04806248.3 | 24.12.2004 | [2006/41] | WO2004GB05454 | Priority number, date | GB20040001665 | 27.01.2004 Original published format: GB 0401665 | [2006/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005070270 | Date: | 04.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1708598 | Date: | 11.10.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1708598 | Date: | 15.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A47J19/02, A47J43/046 | [2006/41] | CPC: |
A47J43/0722 (EP);
A47J19/023 (EP);
A47J19/025 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SAFTREIBE | [2006/41] | English: | JUICING REAMER | [2006/41] | French: | PRESSE-AGRUMES | [2006/41] | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.08.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.07.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/41] | 30.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.08.2007 | CH | 15.08.2007 | CY | 15.08.2007 | CZ | 15.08.2007 | DK | 15.08.2007 | EE | 15.08.2007 | FI | 15.08.2007 | LI | 15.08.2007 | LT | 15.08.2007 | PL | 15.08.2007 | RO | 15.08.2007 | SI | 15.08.2007 | SK | 15.08.2007 | TR | 15.08.2007 | BG | 15.11.2007 | SE | 15.11.2007 | GR | 16.11.2007 | IS | 15.12.2007 | LU | 24.12.2007 | MC | 31.12.2007 | PT | 15.01.2008 | HU | 16.02.2008 | [2012/03] |
Former [2011/22] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
CH | 15.08.2007 | ||
CY | 15.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
EE | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LT | 15.08.2007 | ||
PL | 15.08.2007 | ||
RO | 15.08.2007 | ||
SI | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
TR | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
IS | 15.12.2007 | ||
IT | 24.12.2007 | ||
LU | 24.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
HU | 16.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/44] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
CH | 15.08.2007 | ||
CY | 15.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
EE | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LT | 15.08.2007 | ||
PL | 15.08.2007 | ||
RO | 15.08.2007 | ||
SI | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
TR | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
IS | 15.12.2007 | ||
LU | 24.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
HU | 16.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/41] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
CH | 15.08.2007 | ||
CY | 15.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
EE | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LT | 15.08.2007 | ||
PL | 15.08.2007 | ||
RO | 15.08.2007 | ||
SI | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
IS | 15.12.2007 | ||
LU | 24.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
HU | 16.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
CH | 15.08.2007 | ||
CY | 15.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
EE | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LT | 15.08.2007 | ||
PL | 15.08.2007 | ||
RO | 15.08.2007 | ||
SI | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
IS | 15.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
CH | 15.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
EE | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LT | 15.08.2007 | ||
PL | 15.08.2007 | ||
RO | 15.08.2007 | ||
SI | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
IS | 15.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
CH | 15.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
EE | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LT | 15.08.2007 | ||
PL | 15.08.2007 | ||
RO | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
IS | 15.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/33] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
CH | 15.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LT | 15.08.2007 | ||
PL | 15.08.2007 | ||
RO | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
IS | 15.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
CH | 15.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LT | 15.08.2007 | ||
PL | 15.08.2007 | ||
RO | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
IS | 15.12.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/25] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
CH | 15.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LT | 15.08.2007 | ||
PL | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
IS | 15.12.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
CH | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LT | 15.08.2007 | ||
PL | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
IS | 15.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
CH | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LT | 15.08.2007 | ||
PL | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
IS | 15.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | FI | 15.08.2007 | |
LT | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
IS | 15.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/07] | LT | 15.08.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE895256 (ELEKTROFABRIKEN) [A] 1-17* page 2, lines 44-98; figure - *; | [Y]GB790872 (OSTER MFG CO JOHN) [Y] 13 * page 2, lines 117-120; figures 1-3,5 *; | [XY]DE1084457 (BAUMGARTEN KOM GES) [X] 1-9,11,12,14,15,17 * column 2, line 30 - column 3, line 12; figure . * [Y] 10,13; | [X]EP1051939 (DIEZ STEFAN [DE]) [X] 1,16 * column 6, lines 5-24; figure 4 *; | [Y]GB2374522 (KENWOOD MARKS LTD [GB]) [Y] 10 * page 3, paragraph 5 - page 8, paragraph 1; figure - * |